Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:47:29 (UTC).

Perminas v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Perminas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01675

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asher Perminas

Defendants

Davol Inc

C.R. Bard Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina M. Flores

Attorney at Hart McLaughlin & Eldridge

121 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 1050

Chicago, IL 60660

Defendant Attorneys

Henrique Alejandro Geigel

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Eric Lawrence Alexander

Attorney at Reed Smith

1301 K Street Nw, Suite 1100 East Tower

Washington, DC 20005

Arryn K. Miner

52 E Gay Street, Po Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Michael Kevin Brown

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

William Darrell Kloss, Jr.

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 2

Po Box 1008, 52 E Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Short Form ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Miner, Arryn) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#4

(#11) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Alonzo J. Holloway substituting for Terry Richardson and Brady Thomas as to Plaintiffs David Harrison, Lynn Harrison. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Holloway, Alonzo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-01802. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#8

(#8) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Ohio MDL case number: 2846. (CTO-17) (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Asher Perminas. Related case(s): yes (Flores, Christina) Modified on 11/15/2018 (BIA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Asher Perminas. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Asher Perminas.(Flores, Christina) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2018. (ctp) (JLC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

4 #3

Supplement

4 #2

Supplement

4 #1

Supplement

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Complaint [Doc. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (ESG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14751713) filed by Asher Perminas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, Christina) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Alonzo J. Holloway substituting for Terry Richardson and Brady Thomas as to Plaintiffs David Harrison, Lynn Harrison. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Holloway, Alonzo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Short Form ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Miner, Arryn) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-01802. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Ohio MDL case number: 2846. (CTO-17) (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Asher Perminas. Related case(s): yes (Flores, Christina) Modified on 11/15/2018 (BIA). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Asher Perminas. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Asher Perminas.(Flores, Christina) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2018. (ctp) (JLC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(ctp)(JLC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 11/2/2018 (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Complaint [Doc. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (ESG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:18-cv-1802-Orl-37GJK. (NAS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14751713) filed by Asher Perminas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, Christina) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant