This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2018 at 07:44:32 (UTC).

Perkins v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Perkins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mitchell Perkins

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

F. Entzel

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Mitchell Perkins. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

10 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#10

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/18/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Attachment A - Memorandum Opinion and Order

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM styled: "Perkins Re-Files His Memorandum In Accordance With The Court's September 24, 2018, Order, Dk # *7" by Mitchell Perkins re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #7 RDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Memorandum Opinion and Order, and #2 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/27/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

7 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/24/2018. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

3 #3

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #1

Court-Approved Form

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form, #2 Court-Approved Form). Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

document titled "Perkins Moves Through the Savings Clause to File Under

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against F. Entzel, filed by Mitchell Perkins. (Attachments: #1 document titled "Perkins Moves Through the Savings Clause to File Under 2241", #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Mitchell Perkins. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #10 order. (tlg) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/18/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM styled: "Perkins Re-Files His Memorandum In Accordance With The Court's September 24, 2018, Order, Dk # *7" by Mitchell Perkins re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #7 RDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Memorandum Opinion and Order, and #2 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/27/2018. (cwm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/24/2018. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNM001386. (cwm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice, #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/2018 per USPS website. (cmd) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form, #2 Court-Approved Form). Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mitchell Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against F. Entzel, filed by Mitchell Perkins. (Attachments: #1 document titled "Perkins Moves Through the Savings Clause to File Under 2241", #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less