This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:00:46 (UTC).

PERKINS v. COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 PERKINS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03619

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTIE PERKINS

Defendants

COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY

SHERIFF ROBERT MAIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC A. WEINBERG

Attorney at SAFFREN AND WEINBERG

815 Greenwood Ave, Suite 22

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant Attorney

PHILIP W. NEWCOMER

Attorney at MONTGOMERY COUNTY SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

One Montgomery Plz, Ste 800, Po Box 311

Norristown, PA 19404-0311

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Wagner re: served Summons and Civil Complaint upon County of Montgomery by Personal on 9/11/18 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, ROBERT MAIER.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(NEWCOMER, PHILIP) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply BY WAY OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO filed by ARTIE PERKINS..(WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, ROBERT MAIER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183573.), filed by ARTIE PERKINS.(jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Wagner re: served Summons and Civil Action Complaint upon Sheriff Robert Maier by Personal on 9/11/18 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply BY WAY OF LETTER TO THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO filed by ARTIE PERKINS..(WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, ROBERT MAIER.Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(NEWCOMER, PHILIP) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Wagner re: served Summons and Civil Complaint upon County of Montgomery by Personal on 9/11/18 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Wagner re: served Summons and Civil Action Complaint upon Sheriff Robert Maier by Personal on 9/11/18 (WEINBERG, MARC) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARTIE PERKINS. (jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, ROBERT MAIER. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, ROBERT MAIER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183573.), filed by ARTIE PERKINS.(jwl, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.