This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2017 at 02:48:54 (UTC).

Performance Painting Company v. Ross Group Construction Corp, The et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2017 Performance Painting Company filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Ross Group Construction Corp, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-00643

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Performance Painting Company

United States of America

Defendants

Ross Group Construction Corp, The

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Alden Walls

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

101 N Robinson 13Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

A Michelle Campney

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

101 N Robinson 13Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

John Edward Harper, Jr

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Timothy Lee Rogers

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

 

Court Documents

#18

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

7 #2

Exhibit 2 Subcontract

7 #1

Exhibit 1 Payment Bond

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/29/2017) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 17-cv-643-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Federal Insurance Company, Ross Group Construction Corp, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Performance Painting Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Oklahoma Western (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated per #13 order transferring case. (cla) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting defendants' #7 motion for change of venue; this action is transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/29/2017. (cla) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case and Brief in Support filed by Performance Painting Company. (Campney, A) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Federal Insurance Company . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Ross Group Construction Corp . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Transfer Case and Brief in Support by Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit 2 Subcontract)(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Rogers on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corp (Rogers, Timothy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by John E Harper, Jr on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corp (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corp. (rmc) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by David A Walls on behalf of Performance Painting Company (Walls, David) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by A Michelle Campney on behalf of Performance Painting Company (Campney, A) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2568367. (Campney, A) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ***Staff notes Emailed krisaac@phillipsmurrah.com re payment. (rmc) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ***Set/Clear Flags (rmc) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corp filed by Performance Painting Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rmc) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 11/29/2017.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Group Construction Corporation, The is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A Michelle Campney