This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2018 at 07:48:35 (UTC).

PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc v. Highlands Diversified Services Inc

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Highlands Diversified Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00670

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Highlands Diversified Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Charles D. Davidson

Drew Courtney Bacon Benham

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel H. Bryan

Patrick Krebs

John Keeling Baker

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant's Counterclaim by PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc.(Davidson, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/7/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/23/2018. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc by Highlands Diversified Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #7 & #8 , granted. If they haven't already done so, Mr. Daniel H. Bryan and Mr. Patrick J. Krebs must register with the CM/ECF for the Eastern District of Arkansas by 8 October 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2018. (slb) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Patrick J. Krebs. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3325410. Filed by Highlands Diversified Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel H. Bryan. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3325402. Filed by Highlands Diversified Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Courtney Bacon Benham on behalf of PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc (Benham, Drew) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #4 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 22 October 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/20/2018. (slb) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond by Highlands Diversified Services Inc (Baker, John) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Highlands Diversified Services Inc (Baker, John) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Highlands Diversified Services Inc, filed by PerfectVision Manufacturing Inc.(kdr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Highlands Diversified Services Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-5202. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT068799. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less