This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2019 at 07:33:56 (UTC).

Perez v. ZTE (USA), Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 Perez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ZTE USA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02948

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Perez

Defendants

ZTE (USA), Inc.

MetroPCS Texas, LLC

ZTE (USA) Inc

MetroPCS Texas LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael P Lyons

Attorney at Deans & Lyons LLP

325 N Saint Paul Street, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Stephen Lloyd Higdon

Attorney at Deans & Lyons, LLP

325 North Saint Paul Street, Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher John Simmons

Attorney at Deans & Lyons LLP

325 N St Paul Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie D Clouston

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

James E Davis

Attorney at Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC

2500 Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Plano, TX 75093

John J Butrus, Jr

Attorney at Munck Butrus Carter PC

600 Banner Place, 12770 Coit Rd

Dallas, TX 75251

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#16

14 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#9

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by ZTE (USA) Inc re #18 Answer to Complaint Motion to Strike (Davis, James). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Strike and ANSWER to Complaint filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, James). Modified Docket Text on 12/26/2018 (ajb). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint filed by MetroPCS Texas LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY filed by Anna Perez re: #4 MOTION to Remand (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. MetroPCS Texas, LLC's response to Plaintiff's Original Petition is due on 12/21/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/14/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by MetroPCS Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ZTE (USA) Inc.'s response to Plaintiff's Original Petition is now due on 12/21/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/13/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, James) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE filed by MetroPCS Texas, LLC re: #4 MOTION to Remand (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for MetroPCS Texas, LLC's response to Plaintiff's Original Petition is hereby extended to 12/14/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/21/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by MetroPCS Texas, LLC (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for ZTE's response to Plaintiff's Original Petition is hereby extended to 12/14/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/20/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James E Davis added to party ZTE (USA) Inc(pty:dft) (Davis, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appendix in Support filed by Anna Perez re #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 MOTION to Remand (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Anna Perez re #4 MOTION to Remand (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand filed by Anna Perez (Lyons, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MetroPCS Texas, LLC. (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 101st District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-16599 filed by MetroPCS Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9564851) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index to State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket Sheet in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) C-2 - MetroPCS Texas, LLC's Notice of Appearance and Waiver of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Service documents, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Clouston, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MetroPCS Texas LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZTE (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Lyons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher John Simmons