This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 22:24:30 (UTC).

PERALES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 PERALES filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark J. Dinsmore and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02268

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES

Fullerton, CA 92836

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

DESERT-MOUNTAIN REGION -- BARSTOW OFFICE

OFFICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS DIVISION

FRESNO COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

MAIN OFFICE

SAN FERNANDO BRANCH OFFICE

KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

WEST OFFICE

INYO COUNTY

OFFICE OF INTERPOL WASHINGTON

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY JUVENILE OFFICES

LAKE COUNTY

AIRPORT BRANCH OFFICE

DISTRICT ATTORNEY -- MONTEREY OFFICE

BURBANK STATELLITE OFFICE

TAX DIVISION, APPELLATE SECTION

OFFICE OF JUSTICE MANAGEMENT DIVISION

DEL NORTE COUNTY

MONTE AREA OFFICE

181 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MANDATE of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES (USCA #17-2571) - This cause, docketed on August 3, 2017, is DISMISSED for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). (MAT) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#19

(#19) FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58; The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, now enters FINAL JUDGMENT against plaintiff and for defendants. This action is dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed.(CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

#18

(#18) ENTRY - Dismissing Action And Directing Entry of Final Judgment; The Court allowed plaintiff through August 11, 2017, to show cause why the action should not be dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee nor shown cause why this action should not be dismissed. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth in the Court's Entry of July 7, 2017, dkt. 9, this action is dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed.(CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

#17

(#17) ENTRY - Denying Request to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis; Plaintiff is not appealing a final judgment, his appeal is not taken in good faith. For this reason his request for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, dkt #12 , is denied. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

12 #1

USCA Letter

#12

(#12) MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter, #2 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

11 #2

Envelope

11 #1

USCA Letter

#11

(#13) PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #11 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys and Designation of Record information attached. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

4 #1

Envelope

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Submission FOR CONSTITUTIONAL AND STATUTORY PROVISIONS INVOLVED ARTICLE III, SECTION 2 OF THE U.S., filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #1 Envelope) (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#9) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #5 Motion to admit new related cases; denying #6 Motion for TRO; denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall have to 8/11/2017 in which to pay the filing fee. The complaint is dismissed for being frivolous and failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(B); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). This action will be dismissed without further notice unless plaintiff shows cause no later than August 11, 2017, why it should not be dismissed and should be allowed to proceed. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/7/2017. (MAC) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Bank

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #3 Envelope) (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MANDATE of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES (USCA #17-2571) - This cause, docketed on August 3, 2017, is DISMISSED for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). (MAT) (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58; The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, now enters FINAL JUDGMENT against plaintiff and for defendants. This action is dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed.(CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ENTRY - Dismissing Action And Directing Entry of Final Judgment; The Court allowed plaintiff through August 11, 2017, to show cause why the action should not be dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee nor shown cause why this action should not be dismissed. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth in the Court's Entry of July 7, 2017, dkt. 9, this action is dismissed as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed.(CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ENTRY - Denying Request to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis; Plaintiff is not appealing a final judgment, his appeal is not taken in good faith. For this reason his request for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, dkt #12 , is denied. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/18/2017. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 Bank Receipts, #2 USCA Order)(MAT) (Entered: 08/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) USCA Case Number 17-2571 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #11 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys and Designation of Record information attached. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENTRY - Directing Treatment of Document; On July 24, 2017, the Court received a document from plaintiff asserting a complaint of judicial misconduct against the undersigned. The complaint is addressed to the Court's Chief Judge and dated July 15, 2017. Complaints alleging judicial misconduct are properly filed with the Judicial Council. The clerk is therefore directed to forward plaintiff's document to, Judicial Council of the Seventh Circuit. Plaintiff continues to have through August 11, 2017, to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons set forth in the screening entry of July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/27/2017. Copies Mailed.(CKM) (Entered: 07/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter, #2 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (No fee paid with this filing) **Docketed per USCA letter received via email.** (Attachments: #1 USCA Letter, #2 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #5 Motion to admit new related cases; denying #6 Motion for TRO; denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall have to 8/11/2017 in which to pay the filing fee. The complaint is dismissed for being frivolous and failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(B); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). This action will be dismissed without further notice unless plaintiff shows cause no later than August 11, 2017, why it should not be dismissed and should be allowed to proceed. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/7/2017. (MAC) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO ADMIT NEW RELATED CASES & INVOKE, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Old Case Documents)(HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #2 Envelope) (HET). Modified on 7/5/2017 (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Submission OF JURISDICTION, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #1 Envelope) (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Submission FOR CONSTITUTIONAL AND STATUTORY PROVISIONS INVOLVED ARTICLE III, SECTION 2 OF THE U.S., filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #1 Envelope) (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(HET) (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AZAEL DYTHIAN PERALES. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bank, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HET) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #3 Envelope) (HET). (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less