This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2018 at 07:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California v. International Boundary and Water Commission et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against International Boundary and Water Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jan M. Adler, Jeffrey T. Miller and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02050

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey T. Miller

Referral Judges

Jan M. Adler

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Intervenor Plaintiff

State Lands Commission

Defendants

International Boundary and Water Commission

Jose Nunez

International Boundary and Water Commission, United States Section

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip M. Hoos

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800, P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Hayley Elizabeth Peterson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

U S Attorney CV

Attorney at U S Attorneys Office Southern District of California

880 Front Street, Suite 6253

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Proof of Service

6 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene

#6

(#6) MOTION to Intervene by State Lands Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proof of Service)(Peterson, Hayley)Attorney Hayley Elizabeth Peterson added to party State Lands Commission(pty:intvp) (sjm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler, to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates previously set before Judge Adler will remain as scheduled and will be before Judge Lopez. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv2050 JM (LL). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/29/2018.(jcj) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People of the State of California. All Defendants served. (Hoos, Phillip) (sjm). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by People of the State of California of case(s) 18-cv-457-JM (JMA), 18-cv-1621-JM (JMA) . (Hoos, Phillip) Mod (sjm). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against International Boundary and Water Commission, Jose Nunez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11631203.), filed by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2050-JM-JMA. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Hoos, Phillip)(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Intervene by State Lands Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proof of Service)(Peterson, Hayley)Attorney Hayley Elizabeth Peterson added to party State Lands Commission(pty:intvp) (sjm). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler, to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates previously set before Judge Adler will remain as scheduled and will be before Judge Lopez. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv2050 JM (LL). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/29/2018.(jcj) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by People of the State of California. All Defendants served. (Hoos, Phillip) (sjm). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by People of the State of California of case(s) 18-cv-457-JM (JMA), 18-cv-1621-JM (JMA) . (Hoos, Phillip) Mod (sjm). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against International Boundary and Water Commission, Jose Nunez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11631203.), filed by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2050-JM-JMA. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Hoos, Phillip)(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.