This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2018 at 07:34:48 (UTC).

Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24401

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company

Defendant

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kacey Alana Bennett

Irene Marie Porter

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald Lee Kammer

Daniel C Shatz

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Zurich American Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel C Shatz on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Daniel C Shatz added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Shatz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc. for Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company (Porter, Irene) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit 3

1 #8

Exhibit 2

1 #7

Exhibit 1 Part 6

1 #6

Exhibit 1 Part 5

1 #5

Exhibit 1 Part 4

1 #4

Exhibit 1 Part 3

1 #3

Exhibit 1 Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1 Part 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11100017, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 5, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 6, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3)(Kammer, Ronald) Modified on 10/24/2018 (jao). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENDORSED ORDER administratively closing case in light of #9 the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Zurich American Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel C Shatz on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Daniel C Shatz added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Shatz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc. for Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company (Porter, Irene) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kammer, Ronald) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11100017, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 5, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 6, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3)(Kammer, Ronald) Modified on 10/24/2018 (jao). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less