This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2018 at 07:57:54 (UTC).

Penn-Star Insurance Company v. Zenith Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Penn-Star Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zenith Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Erica P. Grosjean. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Penn-Star Insurance Company

Defendants

Golden Labor Services, LLC.

Zenith Insurance Company

Valentin Romer Colotl

D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership

DM Camp & Sons, a general partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Winter Wendell

Attorney at Nielsen, Haley & Abbott LLP

100 Smith Ranch Rd., Suite 350

San Rafael, CA 94903

James C. Nielsen

Attorney at Nielsen, Haley & Abbott LLP

100 Smith Ranch Road, Suite 350

San Rafael, CA 94903

Defendant Attorney

David Phillip Borovsky

Attorney at Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

1255 Powell St.

Emeryville, CA 94608

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Zenith Insurance Company.(Borovsky, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *DM Camp & Sons, a general partnership* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James C. Nielsen* *Nielsen, Haley & Abbott LLP* *100 Smith Ranch Road, Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#13

(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Golden Labor Services, LLC., Valentin Romer Colotl, Zenith Insurance Company, DM Camp & Sons, a general partnership by Penn-Star Insurance Company.(Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION to Extend Time For Defendant Zenith To Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Zenith Insurance Company. Attorney Borovsky, David Phillip added. (Borovsky, David) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Golden Labor Services, LLC. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Valentin Romer Colotl served on 9/29/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zenith Insurance Company served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership served on 9/29/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#5

(#5) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Consent Form

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Valentin Romer Colotl, Zenith Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Megan Winter Wendell* *100 Smith Ranch Rd.* *Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership, Golden Labor Services, LLC.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Megan Winter Wendell* *100 Smith Ranch Rd.* *Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Zenith Insurance Company.(Borovsky, David) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *DM Camp & Sons, a general partnership* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James C. Nielsen* *Nielsen, Haley & Abbott LLP* *100 Smith Ranch Road, Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Golden Labor Services, LLC., Valentin Romer Colotl, Zenith Insurance Company, DM Camp & Sons, a general partnership by Penn-Star Insurance Company.(Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION to Extend Time For Defendant Zenith To Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Zenith Insurance Company. Attorney Borovsky, David Phillip added. (Borovsky, David) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Golden Labor Services, LLC. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Valentin Romer Colotl served on 9/29/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zenith Insurance Company served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership served on 9/29/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Valentin Romer Colotl, Zenith Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Megan Winter Wendell* *100 Smith Ranch Rd.* *Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *D.M. and Izetta A. Camp Limited Partnership, Golden Labor Services, LLC.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Megan Winter Wendell* *100 Smith Ranch Rd.* *Suite 350* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Parties by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7887924) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wendell, Megan) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.