This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2018 at 07:02:02 (UTC).

Pearson Education, Inc. et al v. Rentu.Com, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 Pearson Education, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rentu Com, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00040

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pearson Education, Inc.

Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC

Elsevier, Inc.

McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Defendant

Rentu.Com, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP - DC

5225 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 503

Washington, DC 20015

Jia Ryu

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP - DC

5225 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 503

Washington, DC 20015

Elizabeth Kenly Ames

Attorney at English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP

1101 College Street, P.O. Box 770

Bowling Green, KY 42102-770

Enters, Katheryn J.

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP - DC

5225 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 503

Washington, DC 20015

Katherine J. Enters

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak, LLP - DC

5225 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 503

Washington, DC 20015

Defendant Attorneys

Sam P. Israel

Attorney at Sam P. Israel, P.C.

180 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Kevin Todd Duncan

Attorney at Duncan Galloway Egan Greenwald, PLLC

9750 Ormsby Station Road, Suite 210

Louisville, KY 40223

Brooke J. Egan

Attorney at Duncan Galloway Egan Greenwald, PLLC

9750 Ormsby Station Road, Suite 210

Louisville, KY 40223

Eleonora Zlotnikova

Attorney at Sam P. Israel, P.C.

180 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rentu.Com, LLC. (Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/15/2018)

#29

(#29) ORDER; 1)Within fifteen (15) days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall show cause why the Amended Complaint should not be stricken from the docket of this Court for failure to comply with Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/15/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 05/15/2018)

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Brooke J. Egan. #27 Answer to Complaint has been filed by RENTU.COM, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (LST) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rentu.Com, LLC.(Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

26 #2

Exhibit B - Authentic Works trademarks

26 #1

Exhibit A - The Auhentic Works

#26

(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Elsevier, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

17 #2

Exhibit B - Certification of New York

#17

(#23) NOTICE OF FILING by Rentu.Com, LLC re #17 MOTION for Eleonora Zlotnikova to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rentu.Com, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4046659), #22 Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Affidavit of Eleonora Zlotniov, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certification)(Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyrights Infringed, #2 Exhibit B - Trademarks Infringed)(LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Intermediate Holdings, LLC for McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Corporate Parent Elsevier Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent RELX, Inc., Corporate Parent RELX NV, Corporate Parent Elsevier STM Inc. for Elsevier, Inc.; Corporate Parent KKR Asset Management, Corporate Parent KKR & Co. L.P. for Cengage Learning, Inc.; Corporate Parent Macmillan Holdings, LLC for Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC; Corporate Parent Pearson PLC for Pearson Education, Inc... (LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Rentu.Com, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Trademarks Infringed

1 #1

Exhibit A - Copyrights Infringed

#1

(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rentu.Com, LLC.(Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rentu.Com, LLC. (Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER; 1)Within fifteen (15) days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall show cause why the Amended Complaint should not be stricken from the docket of this Court for failure to comply with Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/15/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 05/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Brooke J. Egan. #27 Answer to Complaint has been filed by RENTU.COM, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (LST) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rentu.Com, LLC.(Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Scott Zebrak re #26 Amended Complaint; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel.; cc: COR (LST) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Elsevier, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #17 MOTION for Eleonora Zlotnikova to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant Rentu.com, LLC, the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/1/2018. (LST)cc: COR w/ECF Mandatory Notice and registration from to Eleonora Zlotnikova (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #16 MOTION for Sam P. Israel to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant Rentu.com, LLC, the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/1/2018. (LST)cc: COR w/ECF Mandatory Notice and Registration form to Sam P. Israel (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smih for review: #23 Notice of Filing, #22 Affidavit, #21 Affidavit, (LST) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF FILING by Rentu.Com, LLC re #17 MOTION for Eleonora Zlotnikova to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rentu.Com, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4046659), #22 Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Affidavit of Eleonora Zlotniov, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certification)(Egan, Brooke) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Scott A. Zebrak to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4045565)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Zebrak, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Ames, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Scott Zebrak by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Katheryn J. Enters by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail (LST) #1 Attorney Data Sheet) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jia Ryu by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Sheet)(LST) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyrights Infringed, #2 Exhibit B - Trademarks Infringed)(LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Elsevier, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Intermediate Holdings, LLC for McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Corporate Parent Elsevier Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent RELX, Inc., Corporate Parent RELX NV, Corporate Parent Elsevier STM Inc. for Elsevier, Inc.; Corporate Parent KKR Asset Management, Corporate Parent KKR & Co. L.P. for Cengage Learning, Inc.; Corporate Parent Macmillan Holdings, LLC for Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC; Corporate Parent Pearson PLC for Pearson Education, Inc... (LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Rentu.Com, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4029183), filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Bedford, Freeman and Worth Publishing Group, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyrights Infringed, #2 Exhibit B - Trademarks Infringed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(LST) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less