This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:51 (UTC).

(PC) Watkins v. Tuolumne County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 PC Watkins filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tuolumne County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer L. Thurston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01148

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Thurston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond C. Watkins

Sonora, CA 95370

Defendants

Tuolumne County Jail

Jail Sergeants

Jail Medical Staff

Jail Deputies

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failing to Exhaust His Administrative Remedies #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Reasons for Not Exhausting Administrative Remedies, by Raymond C. Watkins. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Raymond C. Watkins. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT of Fact Regarding Cause in Case by Plaintiff Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE/Answer to Administrative Remedies Inquiry by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE "Motion for Discovery (?), Statement of Fact Regarding Order to Show Cause (Document #6)" by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

7 #1

IFP Application

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #4 ; ORDER Directing Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by Tuolumne County Jail, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT of Fact re MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 , by Plaintiff Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

2 #1

Order re Consent

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Raymond C. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Reasons for Not Exhausting Administrative Remedies, by Raymond C. Watkins. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE and MOTION to Attach Evidence to this Case, by Raymond C. Watkins. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Raymond C. Watkins. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATEMENT of Fact Regarding Cause in Case by Plaintiff Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE/Answer to Administrative Remedies Inquiry by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE "Motion for Discovery (?), Statement of Fact Regarding Order to Show Cause (Document #6)" by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Tuolumne County Jail, at 175 Yaney Avenue, Sonora, CA 95370. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #4 ; ORDER Directing Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by Tuolumne County Jail, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order to Show Cause served on Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failing to Exhaust His Administrative Remedies #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT of Fact re MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 , by Plaintiff Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings served on Raymond C. Watkins. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Raymond C. Watkins. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Raymond C. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less