Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:46:07 (UTC).

(PC) Lee v. Central California Women's Facility et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 PC Lee filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Central California Women's Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erica P. Grosjean and Lawrence J. O'Neill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01616

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. O'Neill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashanda D. Lee

Warner Springs, CA 92086

Defendants

J. Espinoza

Central California Women's Facility

J. Jacobsen

 

Court Documents

12 #1

USM Forms & Instructions

#12

(#12) ORDER Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/19. Service is appropriate for J. Jacobsen. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms & Instructions)(Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER ADOPTING #9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Central California Women's Facility and J. Espinoza signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/2019. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ashanda D. Lee. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#9

(#9) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this #1 Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Jacobsen for Excessive Force, and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 #1

Motion for IFP

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

3 #1

Order re Consent

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#1

(#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Central California Women's Facility, J. Espinoza, J. Jacobsen by Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Service Documents Order, served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/19. Service is appropriate for J. Jacobsen. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms & Instructions)(Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER ADOPTING #9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Central California Women's Facility and J. Espinoza signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/2019. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ashanda D. Lee. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this #1 Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Jacobsen for Excessive Force, and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/14/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Flores, E) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-1616 LJO-EPG. (Flores, E) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Minute Order served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Rooney, M) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Clerk's Office is directed to randomly assign a Fresno District Judge to this matter. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/2018. (Rooney, M) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#4) CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Ashanda D. Lee, CDC WE-9227 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Central California Women's Facility, J. Espinoza, J. Jacobsen by Ashanda D. Lee. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less