This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2018 at 08:12:19 (UTC).

(PC) Daniels v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 PC Daniels filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley A. Boone and Lawrence J. O'Neill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01160

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. O'Neill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Marie Daniels

Corona, CA 92880

Defendants

J. Harry

A. Della Porta

K. Lewis

Garcia

Tegtmeyer

Turner

R. Perez

D. K. Johnson

M. Scoggins

Sandra Ramey

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CIW Prison, 16756 Chino Corona Rd, Corona, CA 92880 by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

5 #1

Application for IFP

#5

(#5) ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/06/2018. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

3 #1

IFP Application

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

2 #1

Order re Consent

#2

(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#1

(#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sonya Marie Daniels.(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Docket Annotation served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TERMINATING #7 Motion to Proceed IFP ; Previous Motion for IFP Granted on 09/06/2018 with Order #5 . (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:18-cv-01160-LJO-SAB (PC). (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CIW Prison, 16756 Chino Corona Rd, Corona, CA 92880 by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Flores, E) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/06/2018. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP) (Flores, E) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonya Marie Daniels. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sonya Marie Daniels. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sonya Marie Daniels.(Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.