This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:45:49 (UTC).

(PC) Arana v. Frazier, et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 PC Arana filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Frazier. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01147

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mauricio Arana

Corcoran, CA 93212-3461

Defendants

P. Huelbut

C/O Frazier

C/O M. Hodges

C/O K. Nouwels

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER CLOSING Case as Opened in Error: ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Amended Complaint in Case No: 1:17-cv-1702-DAD-BAM (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#1

(#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mauricio Arana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

E-Service Notice

#2

(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *8/24/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

2 #1

Order re Consent

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Dismissing Case served on Mauricio Arana. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER CLOSING Case as Opened in Error: ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to File Amended Complaint in Case No: 1:17-cv-1702-DAD-BAM (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison at COR.filings@cdcr.ca.gov. (Hellings, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *8/24/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Hellings, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mauricio Arana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hellings, J) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.