This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:39:38 (UTC).

Paul v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Paul filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-00595

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anthony Joseph Paul

Grand Island, NE 68801

Respondents

U.S. Customes Immigration

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Lynnett M. Wagner

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER - This matter will be held in abeyance until April 8, 2019. On April 8, 2019, the government shall advise the court whether the petitioner has been removed to Sudan. If he has not been removed, the government shall explain the reasons for the delay. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 Response to 2241 Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus Relief by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Respondent United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

8 #1

Declaration of Kalob Kresser, Deportation Officer US Dept. of Homeland Security

#8

(#8) INDEX in support of Response by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalob Kresser, Deportation Officer US Dept. of Homeland Security, with Exhibits A-D, dated January 24, 2019)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the United States shall show cause why the Petitioner should not be released pursuant to a writ of habeas corpus and such cause shall be shown no later than the close of business on Friday, January 25, 2019. The Clerk shall change the name of the Respondent to the United States of America on the docket sheet and serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Assistant United States Attorney Robert Homan, Chief of the Civil Division, by providing him with notice via CM/ECF. My chambers shall also send a copy to Mr. Homan via e-mail. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy of letter sent to Hall County Department of Corrections. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Anthony Joseph Paul. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Anthony Joseph Paul. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER - This matter will be held in abeyance until April 8, 2019. On April 8, 2019, the government shall advise the court whether the petitioner has been removed to Sudan. If he has not been removed, the government shall explain the reasons for the delay. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 Response to 2241 Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus Relief by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Respondent United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INDEX in support of Response by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalob Kresser, Deportation Officer US Dept. of Homeland Security, with Exhibits A-D, dated January 24, 2019)(Wagner, Lynnett) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the United States shall show cause why the Petitioner should not be released pursuant to a writ of habeas corpus and such cause shall be shown no later than the close of business on Friday, January 25, 2019. The Clerk shall change the name of the Respondent to the United States of America on the docket sheet and serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Assistant United States Attorney Robert Homan, Chief of the Civil Division, by providing him with notice via CM/ECF. My chambers shall also send a copy to Mr. Homan via e-mail. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Anthony Joseph Paul. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy of letter sent to Hall County Department of Corrections. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Anthony Joseph Paul. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Anthony Joseph Paul. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.