Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2017 at 02:48:03 (UTC).

Paul-Grucza v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 Paul-Grucza filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01626

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gayle Paul-Grucza

Defendants

Thomas Schmalzried MD

DePuy Orthopaedics Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Does 1 through 100, Inclusive

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean A Goetz

Attorney at Law Offices of Dean Goetz

603 N Hwy 101

Solana Beach, CA 92075

John H Gomez

Attorney at Gomez Trial Attorneys

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Ahmed S Diab

Attorney at Gomez Trial Attorneys

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Lindsay R. Stevens

Attorney at Gomez Trial Attorneys

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

David C Allen

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904

Seth Michael Roberts

Attorney at Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75204

Jessica D Miller

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kelley S Olah

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Special Master Attorney

James M Stanton-2244

Attorney at Stanton LLP

9400 North Central Expressway, Suite 1304

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-04024. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#14

(#14) Conditional Transfer Order - 268 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 6/19/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/19/2017)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #10 . A status conference is set for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending theJudicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. Case stayed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

#12

(#12) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

10 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings

#10

(#10) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/05/2017)

9 #1

Attachment to Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on May 31, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Certificate of Service)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/02/2017)

#8

(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-04024 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/02/2017)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case transferred from Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-04024 CAS(Ex). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

4 #8

Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #7

Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #6

Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #5

Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #4

Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-04024. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Conditional Transfer Order - 268 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 6/19/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #10 . A status conference is set for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending theJudicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. Case stayed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on May 31, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Certificate of Service)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-04024 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 06/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case transferred from Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-04024 CAS(Ex). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson, Thomas Schmalzried, M.D..Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Gayle Paul Grucza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/21/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, identifying Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., an Indiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC658948 Receipt No: 0973-19935964 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., an Indiana Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., an Indiana Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson, a New Jersey corporation(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley Spencer Olah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Allen