This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2018 at 07:28:07 (UTC).

Paul et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Paul filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Geoffrey W. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Geoffrey W. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laura Gates

John Paul

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary G. Kirkpatrick, Esq.

Attorney at Kirkpatrick & Goldsborough, PLLC

1233 Shelburne Road, Suite E-1

South Burlington, VT 05403

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Summons as to Dept. of Health and Human Svcs

2 #1

Summons as to U.S. Attorney General

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States of America served on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons as to Dept. of Health and Human Svcs)(law) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by John Paul, Laura Gates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States of America served on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons as to Dept. of Health and Human Svcs)(law) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • ISSUED Summons as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(kac) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by John Paul, Laura Gates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less