This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 04:25:46 (UTC).

Paul et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2014 Paul filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca F Doherty and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-02993

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca F Doherty

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Paul, Jr

Jeanette Paul

Defendants

Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc

Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd

Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc

Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc

Eli Lilly & Co

Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc

Takeda California Inc

Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America

Takeda San Diego Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S Kruse

Attorney at Niemeyer Grebel & Kruse

10 S Broadway Ste 1125

St Louis, MO 63102

Gerard L Guerra

Attorney at Onder & Shelton

110 E Lockwood 2Nd Fl

St Louis, MO 63119

Michael Joseph Quillin

Attorney at Onder Shelton et al

110 E Lockwood 2Nd Fl

St Louis, MO 63119

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan H Garside

Attorney at Fox Galvin

One Memorial Dr 12Th Fl

St Louis, MO 63102

John E Galvin, III

Attorney at Fox Galvin

One Memorial Dr 12Th Fl

St Louis, MO 63102

Margaret D Gentzen

Attorney at Fox Galvin

One Memorial Dr 12Th Fl

St Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

43 #5318

(#46) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca F Doherty: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2015. Next monthly status conference is scheduled for April 23, 2015. (Court Reporter: Cathleen Marquardt) (Attachments: #1 Attendance Record) Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

74 #5287

(#44) SPECIAL MASTERS PRIVILEGE RULINGS by Gary J Russo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Matrix Ruling) Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

77 #5331

(#47) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER TO NON-PARTIES KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. AND KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.'S ANALYTICAL FILES AND OTHER HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 03/03/15. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: This is an Administrative entry of document number 5325, filed in 6:11-md-2299, to spread to all cases. Document number 5325 contains a sealed exhibit (Exhibit 1) which is not attached to this entry as it will remain under seal. ( Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Brown, A) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

78 #1

Attendance Ledger

85 #5344

(#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2015 before Judge Rebecca F. Doherty. Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Telephone number: 337-593-5223. Pages: 1-45. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attendance Ledger)Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Marquardt, C) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1422-cc01165, with receipt number 0865-4383916, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda California, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan H. Garside for Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Margaret D. Gentzen for Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gentzen, Margaret) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

73 #1

Exhibit - Matrix Ruling

46 #1

Attendance Record

#251

(#45) MINUTE ENTRY: Agenda for February 26, 2015 Status Conference. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

253 #1

Exhibit 2

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2015 before Judge Rebecca F. Doherty. Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Telephone number: 337-593-5223. Pages: 1-45. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 4/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attendance Ledger)Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Marquardt, C) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER TO NON-PARTIES KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. AND KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.'S ANALYTICAL FILES AND OTHER HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 03/03/15. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: This is an Administrative entry of document number 5325, filed in 6:11-md-2299, to spread to all cases. Document number 5325 contains a sealed exhibit (Exhibit 1) which is not attached to this entry as it will remain under seal. ( Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Brown, A) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca F Doherty: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2015. Next monthly status conference is scheduled for April 23, 2015. (Court Reporter: Cathleen Marquardt) (Attachments: #1 Attendance Record) Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MINUTE ENTRY: Agenda for February 26, 2015 Status Conference. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) SPECIAL MASTERS PRIVILEGE RULINGS by Gary J Russo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Matrix Ruling) Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: MEDICAL AUTHORIZATIONS. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/6/2015. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Fact Sheet Analysis. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 02/06/2015. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER granting MOTION to Withdraw Jennifer A. Foster as Attorney for defendants (doc #5232 in 6:11-md-2299). Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER: The monthly status conference scheduled for 3/26/2015 is CANCELLED. The meeting of the Working Group scheduled for 3/25/2015 shall continue as planned.Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/22/2015 before Judge Rebecca F. Doherty. Court Reporter: Cathleen E. Marquardt, Telephone number: 337-593-5223. Pages: 1-54. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Attendance Record)Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH et al.(crt,Marquardt, C) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. SIGNED 7/10/14. (MRS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Jeanette Paul, William Paul, Jr.(BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Margaret D. Gentzen for Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Gentzen, Margaret) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan H. Garside for Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda California, Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1422-cc01165, with receipt number 0865-4383916, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Takeda California, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Garside, Jonathan) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 7/14/2014.] (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less