This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:37:28 (UTC).

Patterson v. LivaNova, PLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Patterson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against LivaNova, PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01825

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Patterson

Defendants

LivaNova PLC

LivaNova Deutschland gmbH

LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc.

LivaNova, PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seth Alan Katz

Attorney at Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine, PC-Englewood

40 Inverness Drive East

Englewood, CO 80112

Defendant Attorney

Jared Barrett Briant

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Wells Fargo Center, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80203-4532

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01825 MSK-MEH, to the Middle District of Pennsylvania, to become part of MDL 2816, by Clerk on 8/14/2018. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/25/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LivaNova PLC for LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Seth Alan Katz on behalf of James PattersonAttorney Seth Alan Katz added to party James Patterson(pty:pla) (Katz, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. on 05/17/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc., LivaNova, PLC, filed by James Patterson.(rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - State Court Docket-Registry of Actions

1 #7

Exhibit G - Notice of Consent to Removal

1 #6

Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service

1 #5

Exhibit E - State Court Delay Reduction Order

1 #4

Exhibit D - Hague Documents

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LivaNova Deutschland gmbH from District Court, Adams County Colorado, Case Number 2018CV30783. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6203104), filed by LivaNova Deutschland gmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Hague Documents, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Consent to Removal, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Docket-Registry of Actions, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Briant, Jared) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER re: #12 MDL Conditional Transfer Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/15/2018. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2018 is vacated. Text Only Entry (mdave, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • (#13) Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Transfer Order, InterdistrictTransfer_PAMD@pamd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01825 MSK-MEH, to the Middle District of Pennsylvania, to become part of MDL 2816, by Clerk on 8/14/2018. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/25/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/24/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LivaNova PLC for LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc.. (Briant, Jared) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Seth Alan Katz on behalf of James PattersonAttorney Seth Alan Katz added to party James Patterson(pty:pla) (Katz, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1) Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2) ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3) Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 07/20/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc. on 05/17/2018. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, LivaNova Holdings USA, Inc., LivaNova, PLC, filed by James Patterson.(rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LivaNova Deutschland gmbH from District Court, Adams County Colorado, Case Number 2018CV30783. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6203104), filed by LivaNova Deutschland gmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Hague Documents, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Consent to Removal, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Docket-Registry of Actions, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Briant, Jared) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.