This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/26/2019 at 07:42:33 (UTC).

Patterson v. Georgia Pacific, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 Patterson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Georgia Pacific, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock, Bert W. Milling, Jr and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00492

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judges

Bert W. Milling, Jr

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marie Patterson

Jackson, AL 36545

Defendants

Jeffrey Hawkins

Georgia Pacific, LLC

Timothy McIlwain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Chang Yu

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Mack B. Binion

Attorney at Briskman & Binion, P.C.

P. O. Box 43

Mobile, AL 36601

Yendelela Holston

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

 

Court Documents

#18

8 #2

Disclosure Statement

8 #1

Memorandum of Law

#8

7 #4

Disclosure Statement of Hawkins

7 #3

Exhibit 2

7 #2

Exhibit 1

7 #1

Memorandum of Law

#7

5 #2

Application for Admission to Practice

5 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

4 #2

Application for Admission to Practice

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Receipt for Filing Fee

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Partial Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss & #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marie Patterson - Ref to MJ/Murray (PSU) (tgw) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain & #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC. Responses due by 2/8/2019, Replies due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/18/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Order granting #13 MOTION for Hearing. This action is set for a status conference by telephone on 1/31/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. The MOTION to Stay proceedings pending the hearing is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/18/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER on Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC, #10 filed by Jeffrey Hawkins, #11 filed by Timothy McIlwain. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 01/16/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (nah) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #14 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Murray. (nah) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Hearing MOTION to Stay filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Holston, Yendelela) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Count II, #7 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (clr) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#12) This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. NEF mailed to Plaintiff (clr) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Timothy McIlwain. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Jeffrey Hawkins. (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Emergency MOTION for Telephonic Hearing and Stay of Proceedings by Marie Patterson. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (srd) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss Count II by Georgia Pacific, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Disclosure Statement) (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Disclosure Statement of Hawkins, #5 Disclosure Statement of McIlwain) (Binion, Mack) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Yendelela Neely Holston to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #5 Motion for Chang Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/9/2019. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (clr) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Yendelela Neely Holston to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2329319, Online Credit Card Payment.) & #5 MOTION for Chang Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2329320, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Chang Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2329320, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Georgia Pacific, LLC, Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Application for Admission to Practice) (Yu, Chang) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Yendelela Neely Holston to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2329319, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Georgia Pacific, LLC, Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Application for Admission to Practice) (Holston, Yendelela) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Patterson. Georgia Pacific, LLC served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019; Jeffrey Hawkins served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019; Timothy McIlwain served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019 (tgw) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Georgia Pacific, LLC, Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain. (Summons issued & given to Plaintiff for service) (tgw) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Georgia Pacific, LLC, Jeffrey Hawkins, Timothy McIlwain filed by Marie Patterson. Filing Fee $400.00 paid; Receipt 46031048824. (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Filing Fee) (tgw) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chang Yu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mack B. Binion

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yendelela Neely Holston