This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:54:03 (UTC).

Patel v. Regions Bank et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Patel filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Regions Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00796

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chirag Patel

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Regions Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keren E. Gesund

Attorney at Gesund & Pailet, LLC

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 805

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher D. Cazenave

Attorney at Jones, Walker-NO

201 St. Charles Avenue, 51St Floor

New Orleans,, LA 70170-5100

Richard Blakeman Crohan

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Glenn P. Orgeron

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP -- New Orleans

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Tod J. Everage

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

909 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Reid Allen Jones

Attorney at Wiener, Weiss & Madison

P.O. Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120

Melissa M. Grand

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

301 Main Street, 14Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Michael David Ferachi

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford PLLC

One American Place, 301 Main Street, 14Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70825

 

Court Documents

#1

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Cazenave, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Equifax

1 #5

Summons Trans Union

1 #3

Summons Experian

1 #4

Summons Regions

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Regions Bank, Trans Union, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC's answer due 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

19 #2

Exhibit

19 #3

Proposed Pleading; Order

#19

(#19) MOTION to Quash Notices of Deposition, for Protective Order, to Stay Discovery and for Expedited Consideration by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Grand, Melissa) Modified on 10/22/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

19 #1

Memorandum in Support

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Service by Chirag Patel re #17 Status Report (Gesund, Keren) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#17

(#17) Joint STATUS REPORT by Chirag Patel. (Gesund, Keren) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Stay by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Everage, Tod). Modified on 10/18/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

16 #1

Memorandum in Support

16 #2

Proposed Order

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Notices of Deposition MOTION to Stay Discovery. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Quash Notices of Deposition, for Protective Order, to Stay Discovery and for Expedited Consideration by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Grand, Melissa) Modified on 10/22/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Service by Chirag Patel re #17 Status Report (Gesund, Keren) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint STATUS REPORT by Chirag Patel. (Gesund, Keren) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Stay. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Stay by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Everage, Tod). Modified on 10/18/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Claims Against Regions Bank Pending Arbitration by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Grand, Melissa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.(Everage, Tod) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Cazenave, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Cazenave, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Grand, Melissa) Modified on 9/14/2018 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Corporate Parent Central Source LLC, Corporate Parent Online Data Exchange LLC, Corporate Parent New Management Services LLC, Corporate Parent VantageScore Solutions LLC, Corporate Parent Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Jones, Reid) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Jones, Reid) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/7/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC's answer due 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC.. (Everage, Tod) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Everage, Tod) Modified on 9/6/2018 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Regions Bank, Trans Union, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1821759.), filed by Chirag Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Equifax, #3 Summons Experian, #4 Summons Regions, #5 Summons Trans Union)(Gesund, Keren) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.