This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2018 at 07:57:10 (UTC).

Parks v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Parks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vicki Miles-LaGrange and Gary M. Purcell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vicki Miles-LaGrange

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Alexander Parks

Defendants

Bryan Jones

Kelly Collins

FNU LNU

Oklahoma City Police Department

The Municipality of City of Oklahoma City

Dan Gridley

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Envelope

#14

(#14) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall make partial payment of his filingfee to this Court by October 30, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

12 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kmt). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that Plaintiff's claims re #1 Complaint, be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief canbe granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2018. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/18/2018. (cps) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #13

Envelope

1 #12

Attachment 12-Letter from FPD Office dated 05-23-18

1 #11

Attachment 11- OK County Person Identification Sheet

1 #8

Attachment 8- Declaration G

1 #7

Attachment 7- Declaration F

1 #6

Attachment 6- Declaration E

1 #5

Attachment 5- Declaration D

1 #4

Attachment 4- Declaration C

1 #3

Attachment 3- Declaration B

1 #2

Attachment 2- Declaration A

1 #1

Attachment 1- Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Cover Letter, #2 Attachment 2- Declaration A, #3 Attachment 3- Declaration B, #4 Attachment 4- Declaration C, #5 Attachment 5- Declaration D, #6 Attachment 6- Declaration E, #7 Attachment 7- Declaration F, #8 Attachment 8- Declaration G, #9 Attachment 9- Declaration H, #10 Attachment 10- State Court Document - Disclosure, #11 Attachment 11- OK County Person Identification Sheet, #12 Attachment 12-Letter from FPD Office dated 05-23-18, #13 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Initial Partial Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall make partial payment of his filingfee to this Court by October 30, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kmt). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that Plaintiff's claims re #1 Complaint, be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief canbe granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2018. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/18/2018. (cps) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Receipt for Money Received from Allen Alexander Parks in the amount of $1.45, receipt number OKW500070150 (kmt) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/2/18. (rmc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Alexander Parks. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Offender Statement Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order to Cure Deficiency, #3 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Entered by the direction of Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/24/18. (rmc) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, titled "Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint with the Addition of the Following Declaration, of Element of Cause(s) of Action" by Allen Alexander Parks. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 1st day of October, 2018. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/12/2018. (cps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 09/12/18. (nv) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Enter ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 09/12/18. (nv) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PREVIOUS Cases. (nv) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Cover Letter, #2 Attachment 2- Declaration A, #3 Attachment 3- Declaration B, #4 Attachment 4- Declaration C, #5 Attachment 5- Declaration D, #6 Attachment 6- Declaration E, #7 Attachment 7- Declaration F, #8 Attachment 8- Declaration G, #9 Attachment 9- Declaration H, #10 Attachment 10- State Court Document - Disclosure, #11 Attachment 11- OK County Person Identification Sheet, #12 Attachment 12-Letter from FPD Office dated 05-23-18, #13 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less