This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:39:50 (UTC).

Park Place Corporation v. Carpenter Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2013 Park Place Corporation filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Carpenter Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-PF-10010

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Place Corporation

Defendants

E. R. Carpenter, L.P.

Carpenter Company

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

Crest Foam Industries, Inc.

Domfoam International Inc

Flexible Foam Products, LLC

FXI Foamex Innovations Inc

Future Foam Inc

Inoac Corporation

Inoac USA Inc.

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Ohio Decorative Products Inc.

Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc.

Plastomer Corporation

Scottdel Inc

Louis Carson

David Carson

Valle Foam Industries Inc (1995)

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Eddy

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Dennis J. Lynch

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Travis C. Wheeler

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet - Columbia

1230 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard B. Iwrey

Attorney at Dykema Gossett - Bloomfield Hills

39577 Woodward Avenue

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Deborah Pollack-Milgate

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kevin T. Kerns

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lezlie Madden

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

F. Brenden Coller

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Francis P. Newell

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

3Rd Floor, 1900 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Peter M. Ryan

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Philadelphia

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Edward G. Warin

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

John P. Passarelli

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Matthew S. Noren

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Kutak Rock

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Meghan M. Blinn

Attorney at Kutak Rock - Omaha

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Aaron M. Herzig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cincinnati

1800 Firstar Tower, 425 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Chad R. Ziepfel

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cincinnati

1800 Firstar Tower, 425 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Daniel R. Warncke

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cincinnati

1800 Firstar Tower, 425 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) Order. The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#45

(#45) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Flexible Foam Products, LLC. Related document #43 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#44

(#44) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #42 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

43 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

43 #43

Main Document

42 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

42 #42

Main Document

#41

(#41) Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document #40 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/28/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

40 #40

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit Executed Proof of Service

7 #1

*Restricted*

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) Case transferred to Ohio Northern per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1:10-md-02196-JZ. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-02084-JMC, 6:13-cv-02085-JMC(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 09/12/2013)

4 #2

Summons Issued - Scottdel Inc

4 #1

Summons Issued - David Carson

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Park Place Corporation.(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/01/2013)

#1

(#12) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Order. The Plaintiff in this case has resolved all claims against all Defendants. Therefore, this case is now closed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Flexible Foam Products, LLC. Related document #43 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs' claims against Vitafoam, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, and British Vita Unlimited. Related document #42 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document #40 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/28/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. Related document #38 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/14/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against Leggett & Platt, Inc. Related document #36 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 2/11/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by FXI Foamex Innovations Inc. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Future Foam's Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Future Foam Inc. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 10/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service by Clerk by personal service executed upon David Carson on 9/2/2013, filed on behalf of Park Place Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Proof of Service)(Eddy, David) (Entered: 09/24/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 6:13-cv-02085. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/16/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred to Ohio Northern per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1:10-md-02196-JZ. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. Associated Cases: 6:13-cv-02084-JMC, 6:13-cv-02085-JMC(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 09/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to David Carson, Louis Carson, Scottdel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - David Carson, #2 Summons Issued - Scottdel Inc) Modified on 8/22/2013 to edit text (mbro). [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Park Place Corporation.(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against British Vita Unlimited, Carpenter Company, Carpenter Holdings Inc, David Carson, Louis Carson, Crest Foam Industries Inc, Domfoam International Inc, E.R. Carpenter LP, FXI Foamex Innovations Inc, Flexible Foam Products Incorporated, Future Foam Inc, Inoac Corporation, Inoac USA Inc, Leggett & Platt Inc, Mohawk Industries Inc, Ohio Decorative Products Inc, Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies Inc, Plastomer Corporation, Scottdel Inc, Valle Foam Industries Inc (1995), Vitafoam Inc, Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-4855787), filed by Park Place Corporation.Service due by 12/5/2013(mbro) [Transferred from scd on 9/16/2013.] (Entered: 08/01/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Domfoam International, Inc. is a litigant