This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2018 at 07:39:55 (UTC).

Parham v. University Health Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Parham filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against University Health Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Parham

Defendants

University Health Services, Inc.

University Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M. Brown

2603 Commons Blvd, Suite C

Augusta, GA 30909

Defendant Attorney

W. Jonathan Martin, II

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLC

P.O. Box 1975, 577 Mulberry Street, Suite 710

Macon, GA 31202-1975

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2018. Discovery due by 2/7/2019. Motions due by 3/11/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/11/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/10/2019. Status Report due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/29/2018. (maa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brown, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Brown on behalf of Cynthia Parham (Brown, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

8 #1

Rule 26(f) Report

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the parties to conduct and file a joint 26(f) Report within 7 days of the date of this Order. Attorney John M. Brown shall either file a notice of appearance or a notice he has otherwise complied with the requirements of the Clerk's Removal Notice to All Counsel of Record within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/26/2018. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2018: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (maa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by University Health Services, Inc.. (Martin, W.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by University Health, Inc.. (Martin, W.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by University Health, Inc.(Martin, W.) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by University Health Services, Inc.(Martin, W.) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#3

(#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER for Removal Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/13/2018. (maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit A - Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and C

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by University Health, Inc., University Health Services, Inc. from State Court of Richmond County, case number 2018RCSC1020. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113J-2446956) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2018. Discovery due by 2/7/2019. Motions due by 3/11/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/11/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/10/2019. Status Report due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/29/2018. (maa) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brown, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Brown on behalf of Cynthia Parham (Brown, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 11/2/2018. (maa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing the parties to conduct and file a joint 26(f) Report within 7 days of the date of this Order. Attorney John M. Brown shall either file a notice of appearance or a notice he has otherwise complied with the requirements of the Clerk's Removal Notice to All Counsel of Record within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/26/2018. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2018: #1 Rule 26(f) Report) (maa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by University Health Services, Inc.. (Martin, W.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by University Health, Inc.. (Martin, W.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by University Health, Inc.(Martin, W.) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by University Health Services, Inc.(Martin, W.) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/23/2018. (maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to All Counsel of Record. (maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER for Removal Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/13/2018. (maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by University Health, Inc., University Health Services, Inc. from State Court of Richmond County, case number 2018RCSC1020. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113J-2446956) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(maa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less