This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2022 at 11:03:36 (UTC).

Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, et al., v. Neidorff et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2018 Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, , filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Neidorff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Harkishan Parekh

Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois

Laura Wood

Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund

Peoria Police Pension Fund

Defendants

Jeffrey A. Schwaneke

Centene Corporation

John R. Roberts

Richard A. Gephardt

David L. Steward

Frederick H. Eppinger

Robert K. Ditmore

K. Rone Baldwin

Michael F. Neidorff

Tommy G. Thompson

Carol E. Goldman

Orlando Ayala

Vicki B. Escarra

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Eric Steven Berelovich

Attorney at COHEN AND MILSTEIN PLLC - DC

1100 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 500, W. Tower

Washington, DC 20005-3594

Stephen J. Oddo

Attorney at ROBBINS LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

Scott R. Jacobsen

Attorney at SCOTT AND SCOTT LLP

12434 Cedar Rd., Suite 12

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Carol Valerie Gilden

Attorney at COHEN AND MILSTEIN PLLC - Chicago

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1705

Chicago, IL 60603

Geoffrey M. Johnson

Attorney at SCOTT AND SCOTT LLP

12434 Cedar Rd., Suite 12

Cleveland Heights, OH 44106

Jamie L. Reyes-Jones

Attorney at HARTNETT REYES JONES LLC

4399 Laclede Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63108

Joseph V. Neill

5201 Hampton Avenue

St. Louis, MO 63109

Richard A. Speirs

Attorney at COHEN AND MILSTEIN PLLC - New York

88 Pine Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Greg G. Gutzler

Attorney at DICELLO AND LEVITT LLC - Chicago

Ten N. Dearborn St., 11Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary Faigen

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS LLP - Los Angeles

300 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

Jay B Kasner

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS LLP - New York

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS LLP - New York

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Christopher A. Smith

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Joseph P. Conran

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Peter B. Morrison

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS LLP - Los Angeles

300 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

Winston P. Hsiao

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS LLP - Los Angeles

300 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#106

(#106) MANDATE of USCA as to #101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois: In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 04/07/2022, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. USCA #:20-3216 (ANP) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#105

(#105) OPINION from USCA re #101 Notice of Appeal: USCA Appeal #: 20-3216. (KEK) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#104

(#104) USCA JUDGMENT as to #101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. This is a preliminary judgment and/or opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals.(KEK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#103

#102

#101

#97

#96

#95

RESTRICTED

6 #2

Ex B Scott+Scott Firm Resume

6 #1

Ex A Parekh Complaint

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) MANDATE of USCA as to #101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois: In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 04/07/2022, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. USCA #:20-3216 (ANP) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) OPINION from USCA re #101 Notice of Appeal: USCA Appeal #: 20-3216. (KEK) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) USCA JUDGMENT as to #101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. This is a preliminary judgment and/or opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals.(KEK) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Briefing Schedule from USCA for #101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harkishan Parekh, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois USCA Appeal Number: 20-3216 Transcript due: within 14 days (See attached document for all other deadlines.)(KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #101 Notice of Appeal,. Notice of Appeal filed on 10/14/2020 by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MFG) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #95 Sealed Order, #97 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), #96 Memorandum & Order,, by Plaintiffs Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund, Harkishan Parekh, Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOEDC-8215261. (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#100) Docket Text ORDER: As agreed to by the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall place a complete and unredacted copy of the September 15, 2020 Memorandum and Order [ECF Nos. 95, 96] in the public file. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/1/20. (CDP) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #98 Order to Show Cause,, (JOINT STATEMENT) by Defendants Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than Tuesday, September 29, 2020, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint statement showing cause why the redacted portions of the Memorandum and Order ruling defendants' motion to dismiss should not be unsealed. This joint statement shall be filed under seal only if it contains objections to lifting the seal of any redaction. (Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2020.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/15/2020. (NEP) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER OF DISMISSAL...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this derivative shareholder action is dismissed with prejudice for plaintiffs' failure to seek pre-suit demand on Centene Corporation's board of directors, as required by law. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/15/2020. (NEP) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate etc.) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate etc.) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutzler, Greg) Modified on 3/15/2018 (AAS). (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 . (Attachments: #1 Ex A Parekh Complaint, #2 Ex B Scott+Scott Firm Resume, #3 Ex C EGS Firm Resume)(Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 (redacted version) filed by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:18-cv-00393 by Plaintiffs Laura Wood, Peoria Police Pension Fund. (Gutzler, Greg) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketNotice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/22/2018. (KJS) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 14 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Joseph Neill. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (JWD) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh (Neill, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6347162, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Harkishan Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Neill, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoria Police Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Carpenter Pension Fund of Ilinois is a litigant

Latest cases where Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Centene Corporation is a litigant