This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:59:45 (UTC).

Parault, IV. v. Ogbundiogu et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Parault, IV filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ogbundiogu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Parault, IV.

Defendants

The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Connect One Cabling, LLC

Chimovi Ogbundiogu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Lefeve

Attorney at Gordon McKernan Injury Attorneys

5656 Hilton Ave.

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Paul Wixom

601 Poydras Street, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mandy A. Simon

Attorney at PREIS PLC

102 Versailles Blvd., Suite 400

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) JUDGMENT This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#13

(#13) Joint NOTICE of Settlement by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 Notice of Settlement/Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate Final Judgment will issue. Defendants shall pay $433 of Plaintiff's court costs. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

1 #2

Attachment Ex. A: Petition

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Attachment Exhibit C: Court Record

1 #3

Attachment Ex. B: Settlement Demand

1 #6

Attachment List of Parties

1 #5

Attachment Verification

#11

(#11) MOTION to Withdraw #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Remand . by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 12/28/2018 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

11 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 668965. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1869037), filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Ex. A: Petition, #3 Attachment Ex. B: Settlement Demand, #4 Attachment Exhibit C: Court Record, #5 Attachment Verification, #6 Attachment List of Parties)(Wixom, Jason) (SWE). Modified on 12/3/2018 to flatten cover sheet (SWE). Modified on 12/12/2018 to replace documents per RD 8(SWE). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania shall file, within seven (7) days of this Notice and Order either: (1) a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff, Chimovi Ogbundiogu, and Connect One Cabling, LLC; or (2) a Motion to Withdraw its Notice of Removal and remand the case. No further leave of court shall be required to timely file the Motion to Substitute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

4 #3

Proposed Pleading;

4 #2

Proposed Pleading;

#4

(#4) MOTION to Substitute the Pleadings by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 12/4/2018 (SWE). Modified on 12/4/2018 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JUDGMENT This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 Notice of Settlement/Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate Final Judgment will issue. Defendants shall pay $433 of Plaintiff's court costs. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint NOTICE of Settlement by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • (#12) Notice to Counsel: Counsel for the defendants advised the court by telephone 1/16/2019 that the parties had reached a settlement agreement. Counsel shall file the Joint Notice of Settlement contemplated by Local Civil Rule 16(c) by no later than 1/23/2019.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Withdraw #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Withdraw #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Remand . by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 12/28/2018 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania shall file, within seven (7) days of this Notice and Order either: (1) a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff, Chimovi Ogbundiogu, and Connect One Cabling, LLC; or (2) a Motion to Withdraw its Notice of Removal and remand the case. No further leave of court shall be required to timely file the Motion to Substitute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The #4 Motion to Substitute the Pleadings is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute: (1) R. Doc. 4-1 in the place of R. Doc. 1; (2) R. Doc. 4-2 in the place of R. Doc. 1-6; (3) ; R. Doc. 4-3 in the place of R. Doc. 2; and (4) R. Doc. 4-4 in the place of R. Doc. 1-5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • (#7) ORDER: David M. Lefeve is hereby terminated as counsel of record for plaintiff for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/6/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Strike 3 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/6/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike 3 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: 3 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal, List of Parties, Verification and Corporate Disclosure Statement . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Strike 3 MOTION to Substitute Case Caption by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Substitute the Pleadings by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 12/4/2018 (SWE). Modified on 12/4/2018 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • (#3) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Substitute Case Caption by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wixom, Jason) Modified on 12/11/2018 to remove documents as they have been stricken from the record in accordance with RD 6 (SWE). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.. (Wixom, Jason)Modified on 12/12/2018 to replace document per RD 8 (SWE). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 668965. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1869037), filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Ex. A: Petition, #3 Attachment Ex. B: Settlement Demand, #4 Attachment Exhibit C: Court Record, #5 Attachment Verification, #6 Attachment List of Parties)(Wixom, Jason) (SWE). Modified on 12/3/2018 to flatten cover sheet (SWE). Modified on 12/12/2018 to replace documents per RD 8(SWE). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.