This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2018 at 07:04:23 (UTC).

Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP v. RJG Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP filed a Property - Land lawsuit against RJG Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP

Defendants

Richard J Grellner

RJG Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale E Cottingham

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Lewis T LeNaire

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John D Dale

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-TULSA

100 W 5Th St, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103-4217

Defendant Attorney

Steven K Mullins

Attorney at Lytle Soule & Curlee-1200 OKC

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

9 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10 - OWRB Agenda

9 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Response to PEPL Motion

9 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8 - PEPL Motion

9 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OWRB Hearing

9 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6 - PEPL Protest

9 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Estack Operating Agreement

9 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deed

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Acknowledgement

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Termination of Settlement

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Pre-Settlement Agreement

#9

(#9) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Brief by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Pre-Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Termination of Settlement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deed, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Estack Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - PEPL Protest, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OWRB Hearing, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - PEPL Motion, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Response to PEPL Motion, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - OWRB Agenda)(Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven K Mullins on behalf of Richard J Grellner (Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven K Mullins on behalf of RJG Holdings LLC (Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by John D Dale on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (Dale, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP Identifying Constituents of Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, L.P.. (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Lewis T LeNaire on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Dale E Cottingham on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (Cottingham, Dale) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Brief by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Pre-Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Termination of Settlement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deed, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Estack Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - PEPL Protest, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - OWRB Hearing, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - PEPL Motion, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Response to PEPL Motion, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - OWRB Agenda)(Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven K Mullins on behalf of Richard J Grellner (Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven K Mullins on behalf of RJG Holdings LLC (Mullins, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by John D Dale on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (Dale, John) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP Identifying Constituents of Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Company, L.P.. (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Lewis T LeNaire on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Dale E Cottingham on behalf of Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP (Cottingham, Dale) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2794128. (LeNaire, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard J Grellner, RJG Holdings LLC. (ml) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Richard J Grellner, RJG Holdings LLC filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Panhandle Eastern Pipe Line Co LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven K Mullins