This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:39:37 (UTC).

PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds v. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Ekahi Fire Protection LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00426

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds

Defendants

Bernadette Patinio

Doe Trusts 1-10

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

DOE Partnerships 1-10

Ekahi Fire Protection LLC

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared N. Kawashima

Attorney at Yee & Kawashima, LLLP

1000 Bishop Street, Suite 908

Honolulu, HI 96813

Christin D. W. Kawada

Attorney at Yee & Kawashima, LLLP

1000 Bishop Street, Ste 908

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit "A"

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay; Certificate of Service - by Ekahi Fire Protection LLC. [filed by Donald L. Spafford, Jr., Esq., bankruptcy attorney for Debtor Ekahi Fire Protection LLC] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (emt, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Bernadette Patinio served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

7 #2

AO 399 form

7 #1

AO 398 form

#7

(#7) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Ekahi Fire Protection LLC, Bernadette Patinio. (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

5 #1

Election form to consent

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form. (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#4

(#4) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/31/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/5/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ; Summons against Ekahi Fire Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2114009.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) EO: In light of the #10 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/31/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 02/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay; Certificate of Service - by Ekahi Fire Protection LLC. [filed by Donald L. Spafford, Jr., Esq., bankruptcy attorney for Debtor Ekahi Fire Protection LLC] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (emt, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Bernadette Patinio served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Trust Funds. Ekahi Fire Protection LLC served on 11/13/2018. (Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 11/21/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Ekahi Fire Protection LLC, Bernadette Patinio. (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form to Consent) (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form. (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/31/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/5/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00426 KJM on all further pleadings. (afc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ; Summons against Ekahi Fire Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2114009.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less