This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2019 at 16:25:52 (UTC).

Paige v. Bitconnect International PLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Paige filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bitconnect International PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart, Beth Bloom and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:18-CV-81549

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judges

Beth Bloom

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BitConnect Investor Group

Brian Paige

Defendants

Ryan Maasen

BitConnect International PLC

Bitconnect Trading LTD

Bitconnect LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob E. Levy

Attorney at Gray & White

713 E. Market Street, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40202

Jasper D. Ward

Attorney at Jones Ward PLC

1205 E. Washington St. Suite 111

Louisville, KY 40206

Alex C. Davis

Attorney at Jones Ward PLC

1205 E. Washington Street, Suite 111

Louisville, KY 40206

Abigail M. Green

Attorney at Buchanan, Ingersoll & Rooney PC

One Oxford Centre, 301 Grant Street, 20Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Abigale R. Green

Attorney at Abigale Rhodes Green Inquiry Law PLLC

239 S Fifth Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

R. Kent Westberry

Attorney at Landrum & Shouse, LLP

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1900

Louisville, KY 40202

Bridget M. Bush

Attorney at Landrum & Shouse, LLP

220 W. Main Street, Suite 1900

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#106

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#42

5 #3

Affidavit

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#5

3 #3

Summons as to Ryan Maasen

3 #2

Summons as to Bitconnect Trading LTD

3 #1

Summons as to Bitconnect LTD

#3

#2

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per order DE 48. Closing Case. (pcs) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 9:18-cv-80086-DMM, 9:18-cv-81549-DMM (pcs) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCases associated. (pcs) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 11/13/18. Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAttorney Abigail M. Green terminated. Incorrect attorney added to the case by Attorney Admissions. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Abigail Green. (cw) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney R. Kent Westberry and Bridget M. Bush, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jasper D. Ward, IV, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Abigale R. Green, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jacob E. Levy, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Alex C. Davis, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Kent Westberry on behalf of Ryan Maasen (Westberry, R.) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Brian Paige (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Ward, Jasper) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/31/2018: A hearing on Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief is set for 2/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Owensboro Courtroom before Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr.. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/30/2018 granting #5 Motion for TRO. IT IS ORDERED that within ten days of entry of this order Defendants shall make disclosures as set forth in order; Defendants are forbidden from moving any assets unless specifically allowed by this Court; requirement of security is waived for now; and this TRO will expire fourteen days from its entry. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Brian Paige. Amendment to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended Order (correcting misspelled title in proposed Order) by Brian Paige. (Ward, Jasper) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Brian Paige (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit) (Ward, Jasper) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/30/2018) (DJT). (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/29/18: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable DAVE WHALIN, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD, Ryan Maasen. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Bitconnect LTD, #2 Summons as to Bitconnect Trading LTD, #3 Summons as to Ryan Maasen) (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. Magistrate Judge designation: Dave Whalin. (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Bitconnect International PLC, Bitconnect LTD, Bitconnect Trading LTD, Ryan Maasen Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2580892., filed by Brian Paige. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bitconnect Trading LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Bitconnect International, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget M. Bush