This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2018 at 07:56:06 (UTC).

Pagan v. Jockey International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Pagan filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Jockey International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08539

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Pagan

New York, NY 10009

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

TJX Incentives Sales, Inc.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Target Corporation

Jockey International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrea Lynne Calvaruso

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP (NY)

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/13/2018) (rro) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#8

(#8) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 11/12/2018., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 11/12/2018. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER terminating #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting in part and denying in part #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED in part. The deadline for Defendants Target Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation, and Walmart, Inc., to file their Answer is extended from October 15, 2018, to November 30, 2018. The deadline for Defendant TJX Incentives Sales, Inc. to file their Answer is extended from October 24, 2018, to December 6, 2018. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/11/2018) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Updated letter motion requesting a sixty-day extension of the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 10/10/18. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint requesting a sixty-day extension of the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 10/10/18. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/28/2018) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401218693)Document filed by Daniel Pagan.(pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/13/2018) (rro) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 11/12/2018., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 11/12/2018. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Daniel Pagan 199 Avenue A New York, NY 10009. (vba) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Costco Wholesale Corporation answer due 11/30/2018; TJX Incentives Sales, Inc. answer due 12/6/2018; Target Corporation answer due 11/30/2018; Walmart, Inc. answer due 11/30/2018. (cf) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER terminating #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting in part and denying in part #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED in part. The deadline for Defendants Target Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation, and Walmart, Inc., to file their Answer is extended from October 15, 2018, to November 30, 2018. The deadline for Defendant TJX Incentives Sales, Inc. to file their Answer is extended from October 24, 2018, to December 6, 2018. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/11/2018) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Updated letter motion requesting a sixty-day extension of the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 10/10/18. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint requesting a sixty-day extension of the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrea L. Calvaruso dated 10/10/18. Document filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc..(Calvaruso, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Daniel Pagan 199 Avenue A New York, NY 10009. (vba) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/28/2018) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Daniel Pagan to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Target Corporation. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to TJX Incentives Sales, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jockey International, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jockey International, Inc., TJX Incentives Sales, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401218693)Document filed by Daniel Pagan.(pc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jockey International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TJX INCENTIVE SALES INC A VIRGINIA CORPORATION DBA MARSHALLS is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant