This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2018 at 07:52:39 (UTC).

Pacific et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 Pacific filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01097

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alan C Pacific

Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan

Lynn M Stanco

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Costco Wholesale Corporation

XYZ Insurance Companies

Cross Claimant and Plaintiff

Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Robert M Courtney

Attorney at Courtney & Molter SC

1110 N Old World 3Rd St - Ste 670

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Mary O Levenhagen

Attorney at Kolb Clare & Arnold

125 N Excutive Dr - Ste 206

Brookfield, WI 53005-4814

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

James M Fredericks

Attorney at Borgelt Powell Peterson & Frauen SC

1243 N 10Th St - Ste 300

Milwaukee, WI 53205

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. It is Hereby Ordered that Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/28/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018; Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Defendants Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2019; Discovery due by 10/31/2019; Motions due by 11/29/2019. (cc: all counsel)(asc)

#14

(#14) Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph: The court discusses with the parties the scope of discovery. The court sets agreed upon deadlines. (Tape #10:03:14-10:15:42) (asc)

#13

(#13) Report from Robert M. Courtney Joint Rule 26(f) report. (Courtney, Robert)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 8/24/2018. (cc: all counsel)(asc)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Courtney, Robert)

#9

(#9) DISREGARD; SEE #11 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Courtney, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2018 (asc).

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan. (Levenhagen, Mary)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Costco Wholesale Corporation, XYZ Insurance Companies filed by Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan. (originally filed in Milwaukee County Circuit Court 7/11/18)(blr)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and ANSWER to Any Cross/Subrogation Claim with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation (originally filed in Milwaukee County Circuit Court o 6/25/18).(blr)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Fredericks, James)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of James M. Fredericks in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal. (Fredericks, James)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Costco's Answer and Answer to any Cross/Subrogation Claim

1 #3

Exhibit Motion to Change Venue

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. It is Hereby Ordered that Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/28/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018; Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 1/2/2019; Defendants Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2019; Discovery due by 10/31/2019; Motions due by 11/29/2019. (cc: all counsel)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph: The court discusses with the parties the scope of discovery. The court sets agreed upon deadlines. (Tape #10:03:14-10:15:42) (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Report from Robert M. Courtney Joint Rule 26(f) report. (Courtney, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 8/24/2018. (cc: all counsel)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alan C Pacific, Lynn M Stanco. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Courtney, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISREGARD; SEE #11 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Courtney, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2018 (asc).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan. (Levenhagen, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Levenhagen, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Costco Wholesale Corporation, XYZ Insurance Companies filed by Ascension Smart Health Self Funded Employee Benefit Plan. (originally filed in Milwaukee County Circuit Court 7/11/18)(blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint and ANSWER to Any Cross/Subrogation Claim with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation (originally filed in Milwaukee County Circuit Court o 6/25/18).(blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fredericks, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Fredericks, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of James M. Fredericks in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal. (Fredericks, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Milwaukee, Case Number: 18cv5217 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2877625) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Costco's Answer and Answer to any Cross/Subrogation Claim, #3 Exhibit Motion to Change Venue)(Fredericks, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (amb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #5 Exhibit Ascension's Claim and Complaint) (blr).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.