This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 06:53:22 (UTC).

Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. v. Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00275

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc.

Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Edward R. Reines

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Derek C. Walter

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stephen Bosco

Shawn Chi

Doug W. McClellan

Anna E. Dwyer

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

David G. Wille

Johnson Kuncheria

Jennifer Ying

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Elizabeth Durham Flannery

Jeffrey J. Lyons

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1201 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#519

#516

#548

546 #1

Exhibits A-G

546 #515

#545

#475

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

#185

717 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#519) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #516 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. USCA Case Number: 2020-2155. (ntl) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#518) FINAL JUDGMENT (See document for further details), ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00275-LPS, 1:17-cv-01353-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (545 in 1:17-cv-01353-LPS, 514 in 1:17-cv-00275-LPS) Stipulation to Defer Motions filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/12/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00275-LPS, 1:17-cv-01353-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#517) MEMORANDUM ORDER re all post-trial motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00275-LPS, 1:17-cv-01353-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #516 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification regarding #516 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gaffigan (nmg) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #516 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-3127793.) (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#516) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #153 Order, #444 Order . Appeal filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#515) REDACTED VERSION of (448 in 1:17-cv-00275-LPS, 479 in 1:17-cv-01353-LPS) Proposed Pretrial Order by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#514) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Defer Motions by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
569 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint to May 8, 2017 - filed by Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. in the form of a 2-Video Discs. Filing related to #1 Complaint. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (rwc) (Entered: 03/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc. served on 3/16/2017, answer due 4/6/2017. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • CORRECTING ENTRY: Defendants name was spelled incorrectly, the defendants name has been corrected and updated to reflect the proper spelling. (lmm) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Two Discs containing: (i) Exhibit 3, MinION Mk 1B; (ii) Exhibit 5 to Appendix, YouTube-Oxford Nanopore Technologies; (iii) Exhibit 8 to Appendix, PromethION for Large Scale Nanopore Analyses; and (iv) Exhibit 11 to Appendix, Inside the Skunk Worx. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc. on 3/16/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lmm) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,546,400 B2. (lmm) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lmm) (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Oxford Nanopore Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2103652.) - filed by Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Appendix, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) Modified on 3/16/2017 (lmm). (Entered: 03/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Biosciences of California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek C. Walter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Robert Reines