This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:47:03 (UTC).

Pachira Energy LLC v. Northeast Natural Energy LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Pachira Energy LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Northeast Natural Energy LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pachira Energy LLC

Defendants

Northeast Natural Energy LLC

NNE Water Systems LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared S Hawk

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2613

Jeffrey C. King

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

301 Commerce Street, Suite 3000

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Katherine M. Gafner

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2613

Chad L Taylor

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office PLLC

254 E Main St

Clarksburg, WV 26301

Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office, PLLC

254 E. Main St.

Clarksburg, WV 26301-2170

Frank Edward Simmerman, III

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office PLLC

254 E Main St

Clarksburg, WV 26301

Defendant Attorneys

Kylie D. Barnhart

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Charles F. Johns

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the filing of a notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Pachira Energy LLC (Dkt. No. #27 ), the Court therefore DISMISSES this civil action without prejudice and ORDERS that it be terminated from the active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/12/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pachira Energy LLC (Gafner, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#26

(#26) ORDER CANCELING HEARING: The Court CANCELED the hearing on the Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for September 11, 2018 (Dkt. No. #16 ). Counsel for the plaintiff shall advise the Court further regarding the jurisdictional question no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, September 14, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

(#24) MOTION to Withdraw #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Request for Expedited Discovery, and Request for Expedited Hearing by Pachira Energy LLC. (Gafner, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#23

(#23) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW BENJAMIN M. STATLER TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. #22 ) and ORDERS that Benjamin M. Statler, President of Pachira Energy LLC, may appear by telephone during the motion hearing scheduled for September 11, 2018. Counsel for the plaintiff shall arrange a conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court no later than September 11, 2018, at 12:00 P.M. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#16

(#26) ORDER CANCELING HEARING: The Court CANCELED the hearing on the Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for September 11, 2018 (Dkt. No. #16 ). Counsel for the plaintiff shall advise the Court further regarding the jurisdictional question no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, September 14, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Request for Expedited Discovery, and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Johns, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#6

(#6) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 03:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/4/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Johns on behalf of NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC (Johns, Charles) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Hawk and King. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pachira Energy LLC. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - First Amendment to Exploration Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Model Form Operating Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A - Exploration Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC, filed by Pachira Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exploration Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Model Form Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Exploration Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee Paid $400 - Receipt #0424-2654859. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the filing of a notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Pachira Energy LLC (Dkt. No. #27 ), the Court therefore DISMISSES this civil action without prejudice and ORDERS that it be terminated from the active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/12/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pachira Energy LLC (Gafner, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER CANCELING HEARING: The Court CANCELED the hearing on the Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for September 11, 2018 (Dkt. No. #16 ). Counsel for the plaintiff shall advise the Court further regarding the jurisdictional question no later than 12:00 noon on Friday, September 14, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2018 re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Request for Expedited Discovery, and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Pachira Energy LLC. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Withdraw #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Request for Expedited Discovery, and Request for Expedited Hearing by Pachira Energy LLC. (Gafner, Katherine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW BENJAMIN M. STATLER TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. #22 ) and ORDERS that Benjamin M. Statler, President of Pachira Energy LLC, may appear by telephone during the motion hearing scheduled for September 11, 2018. Counsel for the plaintiff shall arrange a conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court no later than September 11, 2018, at 12:00 P.M. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/11/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Pachira Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gafner, Katherine) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ALLOW MIKE JOHN TO TESTIFY BY TELEPHONE [DKT. NO. #19 ]: The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. #19 ) and ORDERS that Mike John, President and CEO of defendant Northeast Natural Energy, LLC, may appear and testify by telephone during the motion hearing scheduled for September 11, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, Request for Expedited Discovery, and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Johns, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear By Phone by NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC. (Johns, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared S. Hawk. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/7/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid $ 400.00, as to Jared S. Hawk and Jeffrey C. King, receipt number WVNC002337. (wrr) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey C. King by Pachira Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Simmerman, Frank) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jared S. Hawk by Pachira Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Simmerman, Frank) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Edward Simmerman, III on behalf of Pachira Energy LLC (Simmerman, Frank) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 03:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/4/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Johns on behalf of NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC (Johns, Charles) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Hawk and King. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pachira Energy LLC. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NNE Water Systems LLC, Northeast Natural Energy LLC, filed by Pachira Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exploration Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Model Form Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - First Amendment to Exploration Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee Paid $400 - Receipt #0424-2654859. (mh) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less