This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 07:44:42 (UTC).

Owners Insurance Company et al v. Midea America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Owners Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Midea America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01607

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James R Smith

Sturgeon Bay, WI 54235-1702

Owners Insurance Company

Pinkert Law Firm, LLP

454 Kentucky St.

Sturgeon Bay, WI 54235-1702

Pinkert Law Firm LLP

Defendants

Midea America Corporation

ABC Insurance Company

ABC Corporation

DEF Insurance Company

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

DEF Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda P Luedtke

Attorney at Piper Schmidt & Wirth

732 N Jackson - 4Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Richard E Schmidt

Attorney at Piper Schmidt & Wirth

732 N Jackson - 4Th Fl

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorney

Maria DelPizzo Sanders

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4427

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule 41 by Owners Insurance Company, Pinkert Law Firm LLP, James R Smith. (Luedtke, Amanda)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Sanders, Maria)

5 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Peng Xie

#5

(#5) BRIEF in Support filed by Midea America Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peng Xie)(Sanders, Maria)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Midea America Corporation. (Sanders, Maria)

#3

(#3) DUPLICATE FILING. See #4 Motion to Dismiss. NOTICE by Midea America Corporation of Motion and Motion to Dismiss (Sanders, Maria) Modified on 10/17/2018 (mac).

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

1 #12

Midea Disclosure Statement

1 #11

Allianz Corp Disclosure Statement

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit Ex. H - Adverse Party Notice of Filing of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit Ex. G - Affidavit of Ser re Midea America Corp

1 #6

Exhibit Ex. F - Affidavit of Serv re Allianz

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. E - State of IL Insurance

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D - Plaintiffs Counsels Info.

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiffs' Counsel

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - State of MI Insurance Detail

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midea America Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company from Door County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-CV-121 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2942018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - State of MI Insurance Detail, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiffs' Counsel, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Plaintiffs Counsels Info., #5 Exhibit Ex. E - State of IL Insurance, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Affidavit of Serv re Allianz, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Affidavit of Ser re Midea America Corp, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Adverse Party Notice of Filing of Removal, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Notice of Filing of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Allianz Corp Disclosure Statement, #12 Midea Disclosure Statement)(Sanders, Maria)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, upon the #7 Stipulation of the parties. All claims and causes of action that ere alleged or could have been alleged will be dismissed upon the merits, without prejudice, without further notice and without costs. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule 41 by Owners Insurance Company, Pinkert Law Firm LLP, James R Smith. (Luedtke, Amanda)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 9:00 AM is cancelled pending the decision of #4 Motion to Dismiss, per law clerk ALK. (cc: all counsel) (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Sanders, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BRIEF in Support filed by Midea America Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Peng Xie)(Sanders, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Midea America Corporation. (Sanders, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DUPLICATE FILING. See #4 Motion to Dismiss. NOTICE by Midea America Corporation of Motion and Motion to Dismiss (Sanders, Maria) Modified on 10/17/2018 (mac).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text (Exhibit Ex). In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midea America Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company from Door County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-CV-121 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2942018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - State of MI Insurance Detail, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiffs' Counsel, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Plaintiffs Counsels Info., #5 Exhibit Ex. E - State of IL Insurance, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Affidavit of Serv re Allianz, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Affidavit of Ser re Midea America Corp, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Adverse Party Notice of Filing of Removal, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Notice of Filing of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Allianz Corp Disclosure Statement, #12 Midea Disclosure Statement)(Sanders, Maria)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.