This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 02:51:08 (UTC).

Osuan v. New York City Department of Buildings et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Osuan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department of Buildings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Pauley, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Pauley, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nekpen Osuan

New York, NY 10032

Defendants

Denis McGowan

New York City Department of Buildings

New York City DCAS/DCAP-New York City Department of DCAP

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Denis McGowan, New York City DCAS/DCAP-New York City Department of DCAP, New York Department of Buildings. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) Modified on 1/10/2018 (sac). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#3

(#3) LETTER from Nekpen Osuan dated 1/5/2018 re: I am asking for you to kindly grant an extension for my additional evidence and exhibits currently in audio and written form to be submitted via a flash drive. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Nekpen Osuan dated 1/5/2018 re: I am asking for you to kindly grant an extension for my additional evidence and exhibits currently in audio and written form to be submitted via a flash drive. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Denis McGowan, New York City DCAS/DCAP-New York City Department of DCAP, New York Department of Buildings. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) Modified on 1/10/2018 (sac). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Nekpen Osuan.(sac) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.