This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 00:14:30 (UTC).

Ostrander v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Ostrander filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Ostrander

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/10/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

12 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander (at Hazelton FCI) #10 Letter Returned as Undeliverable. (tlg) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

10 #1

notice of change of address form

#10

(#10) LETTER from deputy clerk to Robert Ostrander regarding #9 Notice of Change of Address filed by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 notice of change of address form).(tlg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#8

(#8) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander #5 Letter Returned as Undeliverable. (tlg) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander #3 Notice. Returned as Undeliverable - No Longer at this address. (cmd) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

5 #1

notice of change of address form

#5

(#5) LETTER from deputy clerk to Robert Ostrander regarding #4 Letter. (Attachments: #1 notice of change of address form).(tlg) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) LETTER from Robert Ostrander to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/10/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander (at Hazelton FCI) #10 Letter Returned as Undeliverable. (tlg) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER from deputy clerk to Robert Ostrander regarding #9 Notice of Change of Address filed by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 notice of change of address form).(tlg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander #5 Letter Returned as Undeliverable. (tlg) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to Robert Ostrander #3 Notice. Returned as Undeliverable - No Longer at this address. (cmd) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (tlg) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from deputy clerk to Robert Ostrander regarding #4 Letter. (Attachments: #1 notice of change of address form).(tlg) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from Robert Ostrander to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002378 (tlg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Frederick Entzel, filed by Robert Ostrander. (Attachments: #1 memorandum in support of petition, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.