This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2020 at 11:16:39 (UTC).

Orthosie Systems, LLC v. Quartix, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2016 Orthosie Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Quartix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:16-CV-00998

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Orthosie Systems, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Quartix, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Ronald William Burns, Jr

Attorney at RW Burns & Co PLLC - Frisco

5999 Custer Road, Suite 110-507

Frisco, TX 75035

Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti

Attorney at Sbaiti & Company PLLC

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4010

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Michael James Collins

Attorney at Collins Edmonds Schlather PLLC - Houston

1616 South Voss Road, Suite 125

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

#18

(#18) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. t is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/2/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims, filed on behalf of all Parties by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 06/01/2017)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 05/15/2017)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to #12 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 05/05/2017)

#14

(#14) ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Properly State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 8(a) (Dkt. #11) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)

#12

(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2017)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. Quartix, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Quartix, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2017)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quartix, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6091737.), filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 12/31/2016)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. t is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/2/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims, filed on behalf of all Parties by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 05/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #12 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 05/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Properly State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 8(a) (Dkt. #11) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/26/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quartix, Inc.'s First and Second Counterclaims filed by Quartix, Inc. . (Collins, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ). (Entered: 04/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Quartix, Inc.'s First and Second Counterclaims by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 04/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS, ( Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/9/2017 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III.). Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/3/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Quartix, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Orthosie Systems, LLC by Quartix, Inc..(Collins, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Quartix, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. Quartix, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Quartix, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quartix, Inc., filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 01/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2016
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2016
  • Case Assigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quartix, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6091737.), filed by Orthosie Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald) (Entered: 12/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less