This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2019 at 07:12:52 (UTC).

Andres Orozco v. Restaurants on the Run LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Andres Orozco filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Restaurants on the Run LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02035

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andres Orozco

Defendants

Restaurants on the Run LLC

GrubHub Holdings Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heidi L DeGroot

Attorney at Sessions and Kimball LLP

23456 Madero Suite 170

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Marie Shappley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2050 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

Jon G Miller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2050 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614-7284

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC.. (Miller, Jon) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, OF NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on November 15, 2018. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 served on November 16, 2018. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Kimberly M. Shappley re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. Related Case(s): None (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, identifying Grubhub Inc.. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Kelley Berlin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #3

State Court Notice of Errata re Complaint for Damages

1 #2

State Court Answer to Complaint

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01024210 Receipt No: 0973-22743656 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer to Complaint, #3 State Court Notice of Errata re Complaint for Damages) (Attorney Kimberly Marie Shappley added to party GrubHub Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Marie Shappley added to party Restaurants on the Run LLC(pty:dft))(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • (#15) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 1/22/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC.. (Miller, Jon) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, OF NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on November 15, 2018. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Electronic Filing re Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #9 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #11 , Complaint - (Discovery) e-mailed to Heidi L DeGroot at hdh@job-law.com bounced due to incorrect email adress. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to hld@job-law.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 served on November 16, 2018. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Andres Orozco. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Kimberly M. Shappley re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. Related Case(s): None (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC, identifying Grubhub Inc.. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of Kelley Berlin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01024210 Receipt No: 0973-22743656 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Restaurants on the Run LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer to Complaint, #3 State Court Notice of Errata re Complaint for Damages) (Attorney Kimberly Marie Shappley added to party GrubHub Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Marie Shappley added to party Restaurants on the Run LLC(pty:dft))(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Marie Shappley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon G Miller