This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2020 at 06:27:46 (UTC).

Onyemelukwe v. Caterpillar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 Onyemelukwe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Caterpillar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Mihm and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Mihm

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Obiora Onyemelukwe

Defendant

Caterpillar Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay U. Odunukwe

Attorney at Law Office of Jay U. Odunukwe

170 Milk Street, 4Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Jay U Odunukwe

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAY U. ODUNUKWE

4Th Floor, 1 South Market Street

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel B. Klein

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP

Two Seaport Lane, Suite 300

Boston, MA 02210

Katherine F Mendez

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

Suite 8000, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Joseph S Turner

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

Suite 8000, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Colton D Long

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

Suite 8000, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#70

(#70) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/23/2019. Defendant's #37 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#74

(#74) AMENDED JUDGMENT entered. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#64

No Description Available

#59

No Description Available

#58

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

38 #1

Exhibit 1

#37

(#70) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/23/2019. Defendant's #37 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#31

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA 5) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/4/2017) (Hohler, Daniel). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/4/2017) (Hohler, Daniel). (Entered: 12/04/2017)

#3

(#3) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER denying #73 Plaintiff's Opposition to Bill of Costs, and costs taxed in the amount of $3,649.25 STAND. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/10/2020. See full Order attached. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #73 Motion for Disallowance and Opposition to Defendant's Bill of Costs: Responses due by 12/26/2019 (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) AMENDED JUDGMENT entered. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MOTION for Disallowance and Opposition to Defendant's Bill of Costs (Odunukwe, Jay) Modified on 12/13/2019 to correct title of filing and event in CMECF(JRK, ilcd). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCosts Taxed in amount of $$3,649.25 against OBIORA ONYEMELUKWE (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSet Deadline for objections to Bill of Costs: Miscellaneous Deadline of 12/10/2019 set for parties to make objections. (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re #72 Bill of Costs. Costs will be taxed in the amount of $3,649.25; parties have 14 days to file objections. (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) BILL OF COSTS . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill of Cost, #2 Exhibit B - Bill of Cost Court Reporter Fees)(Mendez, Katherine) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/23/2019. Defendant's #37 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond, Agreed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Klein, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Copy re: #8 Order to Show Cause mailed to Obiora Onyemelukwe on 3/7/2018. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2018.(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) USMS SERVICE INSTRUCTIONS NOTICE (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Caterpillar, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA 5) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/4/2017) (Hohler, Daniel). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/4/2017) (Hohler, Daniel). (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 11/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Obiora Onyemelukwe.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Caterpillar, Inc., filed by Obiora Onyemelukwe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less