This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:37:58 (UTC).

Omnivex Corporation v. OMNI X LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Omnivex Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against OMNI X LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eileen S Willett and Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02521

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Eileen S Willett

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omnivex Corporation

Defendants

Douglas Ralston

OMNI X LLC

Unknown Ralston

OMNI X LLC an Arizona Limited Liability Company doing business as Omniex

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachael Marie Peters Pugel

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Andrew Foster Halaby

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

1 Arizona Ctr, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-0001

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Notice to Parties

#14

(#14) PRELIMINARY ORDER - Any motion made pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 is discouraged ifthe challenged defect in the pleading can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint orof waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than November 7, 2018. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 7, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Parties)(SLQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Douglas Ralston, Unknown Ralston. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JJH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/13/2018)

9 #1

Summons

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Omnivex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to OMNI X LLC, Douglas Ralston, Unknown Ralston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15821826. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2521-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRELIMINARY ORDER - Any motion made pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 is discouraged ifthe challenged defect in the pleading can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint orof waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than November 7, 2018. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 7, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Parties)(SLQ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2521-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • (#12) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Douglas Ralston, Unknown Ralston. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JJH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Omnivex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to OMNI X LLC, Douglas Ralston, Unknown Ralston. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15821826. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2521-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15821826 filed by Omnivex Corporation. (Pugel, Rachael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(KEP) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less