This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 04:43:21 (UTC).

Olivistar LLC v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 Olivistar LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Olivistar LLC

Not Classified By Court

Don Tiller

David Folsom

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Brandon Michael LaPray

52 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#252

#251

250 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#250

#249

248 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#248

#247

245 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

445 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) ORDER granting #250 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Polar Electro, Inc. USA (Member case # 2:14cv543). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/29/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Polar Electro, Inc., USA, Polar Electro OY, and Polar Electro Inc. by Olivistar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) ORDER granting #248 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass filed by Olivistar LLC., Compass Bank (Member case # 2:15cv319) terminated., Attorney Matthew Alan Colvin; Neil J McNabnay; Bret Thomas Winterle; Ricardo Joel Bonilla and William Brown Collier, Jr terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/23/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass by Olivistar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#247) ORDER granting #245 Motion to Stay All Deadlines between Plaintiff Olivistar LLC and Defendant Compass Bank d/b/a BBVA Compass. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/08/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#246) ORDER granting #244 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Regions Bank filed by Olivistar LLC., Regions Bank (Member case # 2:15cv329) and Regions Bank (Member case # 2:15cv329) terminated., Attorney Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr; Earl Glenn Thames, Jr; Stephen E Baskin and Bryan Christopher Nese terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/08/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#245) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Compass Bank, Olivistar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winterle, Bret) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#244) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Regions Bank by Olivistar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#243) ORDER re #61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Spectra Energy Corp (Member case # 2:15cv395) terminated., Attorney Dwayne LeRoy Mason and Tara M Williams terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/08/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
251 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Olivistar LLC.( LaPray, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bank of America Corporation to 5/11/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bank of America Corporation.( LaPray, Brandon) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Olivistar LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Olivistar LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5084867.), filed by Olivistar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less