This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2018 at 07:03:06 (UTC).

Oliver v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2018 Oliver filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02716

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Brandon Christopher Oliver

Defendant

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Sarah Sawyer

Attorney at Offit

300 E Lombard St #2010

Baltimore, MD 21202

Timothy C Lynch

Attorney at Offit Kurman PA

300 E. Lombard Street, Suite 2010

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Final Judgment by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/19/2018. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION in Lieu of Answer by Brandon Christopher Oliver(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Lynch on behalf of Brandon Christopher Oliver (Lynch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018.(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver Notice of Withdraw of Appearance (Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT /MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, filed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Final Judgment by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/19/2018. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver Notice of Withdraw of Appearance (Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Lynch on behalf of Brandon Christopher Oliver (Lynch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION in Lieu of Answer by Brandon Christopher Oliver(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2018, answer due 11/5/2018.(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Brandon Christopher Oliver re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Christopher Oliver was filed without a civil cover sheet. **Please file the civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Filing fee:$ 400, receipt number 14637108730 (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT /MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, filed by Brandon Christopher Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sawyer, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less