This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 03:07:36 (UTC).

Oliver v. Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Oliver filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam E Oliver

Defendant

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Orien Praiser Nelson

Attorney at Robert J Hommel PC

9304 E Raintree Dr., Ste. 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Robert J Hommel

Attorney at Robert J Hommel PC

9304 E Raintree Dr, Ste 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85260-7768

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Martha Andrews

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Kristina Novotny Holmstrom

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews)(KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15025959. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-38-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-056391. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15025959 filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • ****State Court records received on 01/05/2018**** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Adam E Oliver: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Non-Compulsory Arbitration and Civil Coversheet upon Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company on 12/08/2017. ****Filed in State Court on 12/17/2017 and docketed in U.S. District Court for case management purposes.**** (KAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15025959. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-38-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews)(KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-056391. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15025959 filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.