This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:57:16 (UTC).

Ohlsen-Townsend et al v. Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Ohlsen-Townsend filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04093

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Townsend

Storm Lake, IA 50588

Lori Ohlsen-Townsend

Storm Lake, IA 50588

Lori Ohlson-Townsend

Defendants

Derek Troy Scott

Alex Wolf

Cherokee County

Aaron Michael Schroeder

Jerod Dean Clyde

Jerod Clyde

Derek Scott

Alec Wolf

Aaron Schroeder

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven D Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Law Firm

606 Ontario Street, Po Box 188, ***Ecf

Storm Lake, IA 50588

Molly Marie Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Law Firm

606 Ontario Street, Po Box 188, ***Ecf

Storm Lake, IA 50588

Defendant Attorney

Brett C Redenbaugh

Attorney at Redenbaugh Law Office

111 W 6Th Street, Po Box 1284, ***Ecf

Storm Lake, IA 50588

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in Sioux City, Iowa, before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 10:00 AM before Judge CJ Williams (see text of Order for instructions). Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/15/2019. (skm) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/31/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/29/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 4/30/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/14/19. (ksy) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2019. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 01/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/27/18. (kfs) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Cherokee County.(Redenbaugh, Brett) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#5

(#5) DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) FIRST AMENDED STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2018. (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County, case number CVCV025770. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2817183), filed by Jerod Dean Clyde. Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Redenbaugh, Brett) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in Sioux City, Iowa, before Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2020 10:00 AM before Judge CJ Williams (see text of Order for instructions). Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/15/2019. (skm) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 1/31/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 3/29/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 4/30/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Trial Ready Deadline 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/14/19. (ksy) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2019. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 01/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/27/18. (kfs) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as the case presider: No conflicts identified (kfs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Cherokee County.(Redenbaugh, Brett) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST AMENDED STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Lori Ohlson-Townsend and Michael Townsend (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/20/2018. (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cherokee County, case number CVCV025770. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2817183), filed by Jerod Dean Clyde. Scheduling Report due by 1/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Redenbaugh, Brett) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.