This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:52:47 (UTC).

Ochocki v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Ochocki filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04122

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Allen Ochocki

Chicago, IL 60605

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Koliner

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Stephanie C. Bengford

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638, 357.2341, Fax: 330.4402

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#7

(#7) MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff Scott Allen Ochocki (SAC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

6 #1

Env postmarked 10/10/18

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Scott Allen Ochocki re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Env postmarked 10/10/18) (DJP) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Allen Ochocki. (SLW) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

3 #1

Envelope no postmark date

#3

(#3) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 08-40119 filed by Scott Allen Ochocki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope no postmark date) (SLW) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#2

(#2) New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet and 2255 packet sent by Clerk's Office to Scott Ochocki. (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #1

Envelope postmarked 9/19/18

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: CR08-40119-01 filed by Scott Allen Ochocki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9/19/18) (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff Scott Allen Ochocki (SAC) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Scott Allen Ochocki re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Env postmarked 10/10/18) (DJP) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLW) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Allen Ochocki. (SLW) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 08-40119 filed by Scott Allen Ochocki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope no postmark date) (SLW) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet and 2255 packet sent by Clerk's Office to Scott Ochocki. (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: CR08-40119-01 filed by Scott Allen Ochocki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 9/19/18) (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.