This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2015 at 10:09:48 (UTC).

Ochoa et al v. McDonald's Corp et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 Ochoa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against McDonald's Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-02098

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jasmine Hedgepeth

Stephanie Ochoa

Yadira Rodriguez

Ernestina Sandoval

Defendants

McDonald's Corp.

McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.

McDonald's U.S.A., LLC

The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barbara Jane Chisholm

Attorney at Altshuer Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Matthew J. Murray

Attorney at Atshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Patrick Casey Pitts

Attorney at Alsthuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Michael Rubin

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Joseph Marc Sellers

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC

1100 New York Avenue

Washington, DC 20005-3964

Abigail Evans Shafroth

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers Toll

1100 New York Ave., N.W., East Tower, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence C. DiNardo

Attorney at JONES, DAY, REAVIS 7 POGUE

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60606-1692

Brent D. Knight

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

Jonathan M. Linus

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Elizabeth B. McRee

Attorney at Jones Day

77 W. Wacker Dr, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Allison B. Moser

Attorney at JONES DAY

1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Catherine Suzanne Nasser

Attorney at Jones Day

555 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Fred W. Alvarez

Attorney at JONES DAY

1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

John Laurence Fitzgerald

Three Embarcadero Center, Eighth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Lisa R. Gorman

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gray LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeanine A Scalero

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dennis Daniel Strazulo

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bruce E. Weisenberg

Attorney at Freeman Mathis and Gary

Three Embarcadero Center, Eighth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for County of Alameda. Their case number is RG14717102. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8596857). Filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Declaration Declaraton of Edward J. Smith ISO Notice of Removal

#2

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership re #2 Notice of Removal. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership re #2 Notice of Removal. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

#5

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin CORRECTION OF DOCKET #5 (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

6 #1

Standing Order

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#7

(#7) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#89

(#97) Declaration of Michael Smith in Support of #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Related document(s) #87 , #88 , #89 , #91 , #85 , #90 , #92 , #86 ) (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 4/10/2015) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

91 #9

*Restricted*

91 #8

*Restricted*

91 #11

*Restricted*

91 #10

*Restricted*

91 #12

*Restricted*

86 #14

*Restricted*

87 #2

Exhibit A Part I

87 #1

Declaration Matthew J. Murray

239 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER by Judge James Donato denying without prejudice #85 , #86 , #87 , #88 , #89 , #90 , #91 , and #92 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Any renewed motion must be filed by 4/20/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Declaration of Savan N. Vaghani in Support of #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) Declaration of Savan N. Vaghani Submitted Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(E)(1) in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed byMcDonald's Corp., McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. (Related document(s) #87 , #88 , #89 , #91 , #85 , #90 , #92 , #86 ) (Nasser, Catherine) (Filed on 4/10/2015) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) Declaration of Michael Smith in Support of #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #91 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued), #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Related document(s) #87 , #88 , #89 , #91 , #85 , #90 , #92 , #86 ) (Fitzgerald, John) (Filed on 4/10/2015) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval re #70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2015) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and order granting in part and denying in part #67 Motion to Modify Case Management Deadlines and denying as moot #68 Stipulation Shortening Time for Hearing. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Order granting in part and denying in part #69 Stipulation entered by Hon. James Donato. The parties have bombarded the Court with multiple requests to extend case management dates set in August 2014. The Court previously advised the parties that those dates should be treated as firm unless genuine good cause exists to move them. In the multiple continuance requests the parties have made, little good cause is apparent. The effect of these creeping deadline continuances is to jam the Court's schedule to the prejudice of other pending cases. For this particular request, the Court grants no more than an extra 5 days for the opposition and reply briefs. The parties should have worked out the expert issues long ago. The May 13, 2015, class certification hearing date will not be moved unless the Court's schedule for other matters requires that. The Court will issue orders on the other pending requests separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #70 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted). Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66, #2 Exhibit 67, #3 Exhibit 70, #4 Exhibit 71, #5 Exhibit 73, #6 Exhibit 81, #7 Exhibit 82, #8 Exhibit 66, #9 Exhibit 67, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71, #12 Exhibit 73, #13 Exhibit 81, #14 Exhibit 82)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 61, #7 Exhibit 62, #8 Exhibit 63, #9 Exhibit 64, #10 Exhibit 65 Part I, #11 Exhibit 65 Part II, #12 Exhibit 65 Part III)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Continued) filed by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 48 Part I, #12 Exhibit 48 Part II, #13 Exhibit 48 Part III, #14 Exhibit 52, #15 Exhibit 53, #16 Exhibit 54, #17 Exhibit 55, #18 Exhibit 56, #19 Exhibit 57, #20 Exhibit 58, #21 Exhibit 59, #22 Exhibit 60)(Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin CORRECTION OF DOCKET #5 (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Jasmine Hedgepeth, Stephanie Ochoa, Yadira Rodriguez, Ernestina Sandoval (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Murray (Murray, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership re #2 Notice of Removal. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (modied to include attachments) from Superior Court for County of Alameda. Their case number is RG14717102. (). Filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaraton of Edward J. Smith ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for County of Alameda. Their case number is RG14717102. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8596857). Filed byThe Edward J. Smith and Valerie S. Smith Family Limited Partnership. (Weisenberg, Bruce) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.