This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2018 at 07:47:33 (UTC).

Nyreen v. POET, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Nyreen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against POET, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04118

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barb Anne Nyreen

Defendant

POET, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J. King

Attorney at King Law Firm

141 North Main Avenue, Suite 700

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy R. Shattuck

Attorney at Woods, Fuller, Shultz & Smith, PC

Po Box 5027, 336-3890, Fax: 339-3357

Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5027

Scott M. Gilbert

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Lilian Doan Davis

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPLY to Motion Response re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) Modified on 11/16/2018 (SLT). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lilian Doan Davis for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott M. Gilbert for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Barb Anne Nyreen. (KLE) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Attorney Lilian Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904780) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney Scott M. Gilbert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904773) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND ADDITIONAL AND/OR AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by POET, LLC . (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) NOTICE by POET, LLC TO PLAINTIFF OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by POET, LLC. Filed in shell case on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(JLS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Motion Response re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) Modified on 11/16/2018 (SLT). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lilian Doan Davis for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott M. Gilbert for POET, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/06/2018. (KLE) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Barb Anne Nyreen. (KLE) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Attorney Lilian Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904780) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Attorney Scott M. Gilbert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2904773) by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (COUNT III), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND ADDITIONAL AND/OR AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by POET, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by POET, LLC . (Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by POET, LLC TO PLAINTIFF OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Shattuck, Timothy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Filing Fee Received from POET, LLC. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2879707. (JLS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by POET, LLC. Filed in shell case on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(JLS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less