This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin A. Smyth

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael P. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jane M. Love

Andrew Blythe

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC.(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/28/16. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/25/27. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,187,405. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

6 #1

Certifications for Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah K. Tsou - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/5/2018) (ntl). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda Hollis, Jay P. Lefkowitz and Gregory Springsted - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#20

(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#18

(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents; and (2) The File History for the Asserted Patent filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC.(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

15 #1

Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding

#15

(#12) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 17 per request of counsel. (ntl) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah K. Tsou - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/5/2018) (ntl). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda Hollis, Jay P. Lefkowitz and Gregory Springsted - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents; and (2) The File History for the Asserted Patent filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Elizabeth LLC filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC.(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Actavis Elizabeth LLC served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01043-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC on 7/13/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 7/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,187,405. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/28/16. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/25/27. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2419104.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.