This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2022 at 02:05:33 (UTC).

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Accord Healthcare Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Accord Healthcare Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kent A. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01043

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent A. Jordan

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Emcure Pharmaceuticals

Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Torrent Pharma Inc.

Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA

Counter Claimants

HEC Pharm Group

HEC Pharm Co., Ltd.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin A. Smyth

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert W. Trenchard

Andrew Blythe

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

Megan C. Haney

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Louis H. Weinstein

Frederick L. Cottrell, III

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

David B. Abramowitz

Michael J. Gaertner

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Paul J. Skiermont

Sarah E. Spires

Other Attorneys

Helena C. Rychlicki

Attorney at Pinckney, Weidinger, Urban & Joyce LLC

2 Mill Road, Suite 204

Wilmington, DE 19806

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

74 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#818

(#818) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Joint Status Report - re (38 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) Order, (55 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS) Order,. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#817

(#817) FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF INJUNCTION - re Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 1/21/21. (amf) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#816

(#816) PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#815

(#815) ORDER - In accordance with the Court's December 10, 2020 Order (D.I. #810 ), the Clerk's Office is hereby directed to unseal the Memorandum Opinion of December 10, 2020 (D.I. #809 ). Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/16/2020. (amf) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#814

(#814) Letter to The Honorable Kent A. Jordan from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Parties' Request to Unseal Memorandum Opinion (D.I. 809) - re #810 Order,. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#813

(#813) ORDER - Plaintiff Novartis's Motion to Extinguish Any Claim by Defendant HEC To The Preliminary Injunction Bond (D.I. #785 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/15/2020. (amf) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#810

(#810) ORDER, re D.I. #809 Memorandum Opinion (UNDER SEAL). Counsel shall provide the Court with proposed redactions to that document on or before the close of business on December 21, 2020. After that time the Court will unseal the Memorandum Opinion, setting forth the rulings, with any redactions deemed appropriate by the Court. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/10/2020. (myr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#809

(#810) ORDER, re D.I. #809 Memorandum Opinion (UNDER SEAL). Counsel shall provide the Court with proposed redactions to that document on or before the close of business on December 21, 2020. After that time the Court will unseal the Memorandum Opinion, setting forth the rulings, with any redactions deemed appropriate by the Court. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/10/2020. (myr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

785 #2

Text of Proposed Order

785 #1

Exhibit A-B

785 #785

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#1

848 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Burke for the purpose of exploring ADR. Please see the Court's Standing Order No. 2022-2 dated March 14, 2022. (dlb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#818) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Joint Status Report - re (38 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) Order, (55 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS) Order,. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#817) FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF INJUNCTION - re Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 1/21/21. (amf) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#816) PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#815) ORDER - In accordance with the Court's December 10, 2020 Order (D.I. #810 ), the Clerk's Office is hereby directed to unseal the Memorandum Opinion of December 10, 2020 (D.I. #809 ). Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/16/2020. (amf) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#814) Letter to The Honorable Kent A. Jordan from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Parties' Request to Unseal Memorandum Opinion (D.I. 809) - re #810 Order,. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#813) ORDER - Plaintiff Novartis's Motion to Extinguish Any Claim by Defendant HEC To The Preliminary Injunction Bond (D.I. #785 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/15/2020. (amf) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#812) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/15/2020. (amf) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#811) ORDER, denying D.I. #784 Motion for partial Stay of the final judgment; denying as moot D.I. #796 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/10/2020. (myr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#810) ORDER, re D.I. #809 Memorandum Opinion (UNDER SEAL). Counsel shall provide the Court with proposed redactions to that document on or before the close of business on December 21, 2020. After that time the Court will unseal the Memorandum Opinion, setting forth the rulings, with any redactions deemed appropriate by the Court. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 12/10/2020. (myr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
931 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Accord Healthcare Inc., HEC Pharm Group, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (nmg) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Accord Healthcare Inc. on 7/18/2018; Alkem Laboratories Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Aurobindo Pharma Limited on 7/18/2018; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Biocon Limited on 7/18/2018; Biocon Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Bionpharma Inc. on 7/18/2018; Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Cadila Healthcare Limited on 7/18/2018; Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Emcure Pharmaceuticals on 7/18/2018; Ezra Ventures, LLC on 7/18/2018; First Time US Generics LLC on 7/18/2018; Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA on 7/18/2018; Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm Group on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm USA Inc. on 7/18/2018; Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 7/18/2018; Hetero Labs Limited on 7/18/2018; Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V on 7/18/2018; Hetero USA Inc. on 7/18/2018; Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited on 7/18/2018; MSN Laboratories Private Limited on 7/18/2018; MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 7/18/2018; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Nostrum Laboratories Inc. on 7/18/2018; Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 7/18/2018; Par Pharmaceutical Inc. on 7/18/2018; Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. on 7/18/2018; S&B Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Strides Global Pharma Private Limited on 7/18/2018; Strides Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Torrent Pharma Inc. on 7/18/2018; Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 7/18/2018. (sar) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,187,405. (nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/25/2027. (nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ezra Ventures, LLC, First Time US Generics LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Strides Pharma, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2420075.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEC Pharm Group is a litigant

Latest cases where HEC PHARM USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. is a litigant